Stephen Matteo v. Chase Metals Service Corporation et al

Plaintiff: STEPHEN MATTEO
Defendant: DAVID H WOLAN, CHASE METALS SERVICE CORPORATION, LUKE MCCAIN, METALS.COM, JONATHAN SACHS, TMTE Inc, Chase Metals, LLC, Chase Metals, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, David H. Wolan, TEM Inc, Chase Metals and Chasemetals.com
Case Number: 2:2019cv01223
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo, upon Defendant TMTE Inc served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRONT DESK PERSONNEL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 11, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo, upon Defendant Chase Metals, Inc. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRONT DESK PERSONNEL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo, upon Defendant Chase Metals, LLC served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRONT DESK PERSONNEL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 11, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo, upon Defendant Chasemetals.com served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRONT DESK PERSONNEL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo, upon Defendant Chase Metals served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FROND DESK PERSONNEL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo, upon Defendant TEM Inc served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Front Desk Personnel in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Due dilligence)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #17 as to Defendants CHASE METALS, CHASEMETALS.COM, Chase Metals, Inc., Chase Metals, LLC, TMTE INC. (jp)
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Matteo. (Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo. Re: Amended Complaint/Petition, #17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Chase Metals Service Corporation, Luke McCain, Metals.com, Jonathan Sachs, David H. Wolan, CHASE METALS, CHASEMETALS.COM, Chase Metals, LLC, Chase Metals, Inc., TEM INC., TMTE INC. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Stephen Matteo(Kerendian, Shahbod)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (subsequent documents) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. (2) The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall take notice of the CM/ECF procedures. Any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Matteo, SUMMON AND COMPLAINT served on MARCH 7, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #12 for the following reasons: (1) Title page is missing; (2) Plaintiff shall refile the document with a title/caption page pursuant to L.R. 11-3.8. (jp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 3/26/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 13] PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Matteo, SUMMON AND COMPLAINT served on MARCH 7, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kerendian, Shahbod) Modified on 3/26/2019 (jp).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE THE SUBMISSION OF COURTESY COPIES OF COMPLAINT (DKT. #1 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.5 and this Court's Standing Order 9(e), parties are required to submit courtesy copies of all initial pleadings and motion papers, among other filings. Copies must be printed from CM/ECF and must include the CM/ECF-generated header, unobscured by stapling or binding. The parties are directed to review the Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders, and to submit the Complaint by March 1, 2019 to the 4th Floor of the First Street Courthouse. The parties are also reminded to review and comply with the Local Rules and Standing Orders with respect to all future filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Chase Metals Service Corporation. (bp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Stephen Matteo. (Kerendian, Shahbod)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Name of Court is missing.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF STEPHEN MATTEO. (Kerendian, Shahbod)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF STEPHEN MATTEO, (Kerendian, Shahbod)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff STEPHEN MATTEO. (Kerendian, Shahbod)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23234730 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF STEPHEN MATTEO. (Attorney Shahbod D Kerendian added to party STEPHEN MATTEO(pty:pla))(Kerendian, Shahbod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Matteo v. Chase Metals Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID H WOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE METALS SERVICE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUKE MCCAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METALS.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN SACHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMTE Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Metals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Metals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Wolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEM Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Metals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasemetals.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN MATTEO
Represented By: Shahbod D Kerendian
Represented By: Edrin Shamtob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?