Anthony Bridget v. Telecare Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Bridget
Defendant: La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Kim Ishimine, Telecare Corporation, DOES 1-100, inclusive, and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01224
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF ANTHONY BRIDGET'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO REMAND THIS CASE TO STATE COURT (DKT. #16 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on April 12, 2019, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bridget. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Shegerian, Carney)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel L. Gradstein in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Remand Case to State Court, #2 Declaration of Senta L. Carter in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Remand Case to State Court)(Gradstein, Rachel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bridget. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Anthony Nguyen In Support of MTR, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shegerian, Carney)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01224 AB(JCx). (rn)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Peters, Kristen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #10 served on February 21, 2019. (Peters, Kristen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
February 19, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHE EXHBIT 2)(ghap)
February 19, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Anthony Bridget. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation, re Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Declaration #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #7 , Declaration #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on February 19, 2019. (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation, identifying 1. Anthony Bridget (Plaintiff) 2. Telecare Corporation dba La Casa Mental Health Center (Defendant) 3. Kim Ishimine (Defendant). (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Senta L Carter re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Rachel L. Gradstein re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Peters, Kristen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV00324 Receipt No: 0973-23235103 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Kim Ishimine, La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center, Telecare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party Kim Ishimine(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party Telecare Corporation(pty:dft))(Peters, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Bridget v. Telecare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Casa Mental Health Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Dana L Peterson
Represented By: Rachel Gradstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Ishimine
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Dana L Peterson
Represented By: Rachel Gradstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecare Corporation
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Dana L Peterson
Represented By: Rachel Gradstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bridget
Represented By: Gloria Tumanyan
Represented By: Carney R Shegerian
Represented By: Anthony Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?