Jane Doe v. Los Angeles Police Officer Munoz et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Police Officer Munoz and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01227
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Service Documents - Service/ Waivers of Summons and Complaint - select - Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed 21 days. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Sedaghatfar, Anahita)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Munoz, (Shepherd, Surekha)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Munoz.(Attorney Surekha A Shepherd added to party Munoz(pty:dft))(Shepherd, Surekha)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant Munoz served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Mark, Subpoena Control, Person in Charge in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sedaghatfar, Anahita)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anahita Sedaghatfar counsel for Plaintiff Jane Doe. Adding PLAITNIFF as counsel of record for JANE DOE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF JANE DOE. (Sedaghatfar, Anahita)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan R Gyongyos counsel for Plaintiff Jane Doe. Adding Megan R. Gyongyos as counsel of record for Plaintiff Jane Doe for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Gyongyos, Megan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Does, Munoz. (esa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, identifying Jane Doe, Brian T. Dunn, Anahita Sedaghatfar, Megan R. Gyongyos, and Los Angeles Police Officer Munoz. (Dunn, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dunn, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dunn, Brian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23235756 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attorney Brian T Dunn added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla))(Dunn, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. Los Angeles Police Officer Munoz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Megan R Gyongyos
Represented By: Anahita Sedaghatfar
Represented By: Brian T Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Munoz
Represented By: Surekha A Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?