United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Veranda Associates, LP et al

Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club and Jessie James Davis IV
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Inclusive and Veranda Associates, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01232
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Airene Williamson on behalf of Defendant Veranda Associates, LP (Attorney Airene Williamson added to party Veranda Associates, LP(pty:dft))(Williamson, Airene)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01232 SVW(RAOx). (rn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Veranda Associates, LP. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, identifying VERANDA ASSOCIATES, LP. (Wakefield, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jessie James Davis IV, United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members. (Wakefield, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23236548 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members, Jessie James Davis IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Complaint, #2 Exhibit B To Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Jessie James Davis IV(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wakefield added to party United African-Asian Abilities Club, On Behalf Of Itself And Its Members(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United African-Asian Abilities Club et al v. Veranda Associates, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United African-Asian Abilities Club
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie James Davis IV
Represented By: David C Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veranda Associates, LP
Represented By: Airene Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?