Janet Mausner v. Telebrands Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Janet Mausner
Defendant: Telebrands Corp., Bulbhead, Bulbhead.com LLC, Does 1 through 30, inclusive and Polar Pooch
Case Number: 2:2019cv01233
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case number BC710680 for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. (See document for details). Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
February 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendants Telebrands Corp. [ FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/10/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) Modified on 2/21/2019 (et).
February 19, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bulbhead, Bulbhead.com LLC, Does 1 through 30, inclusive, Polar Pooch, Telebrands Corp., filed by Plaintiff Janet Mausner. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 .(et)
February 19, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bulbhead, Bulbhead.com LLC, Does 1 through 30, inclusive, Polar Pooch, Telebrands Corp., filed by Plaintiff Janet Mausner. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/20/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Telebrands Corp.. (Cimmarusti, Patrick)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Telebrands Corp., identifying Colony Insurance. (Cimmarusti, Patrick)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Telebrands Corp.. (Cimmarusti, Patrick)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, Los Angeles County, case number BC710680 Receipt No: 0973-23236577 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Telebrands Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H) (Attorney Patrick J Cimmarusti added to party Telebrands Corp.(pty:dft))(Cimmarusti, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janet Mausner v. Telebrands Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telebrands Corp.
Represented By: Patrick J Cimmarusti
Represented By: Joseph Jackson McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulbhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulbhead.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Pooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Mausner
Represented By: Leigh E Charness
Represented By: Jeffrey N Mausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?