Albert Kirakosian et al v. Sonic Imports, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Albert Kirakosian and Kiraco, LLC
Defendant: Sonic Imports, Inc. and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01235
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sonic Imports, Inc., (Roberts, Jason)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Sonic Imports, Inc..(Attorney Jason S Roberts added to party Sonic Imports, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roberts, Jason)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Albert Kirakosian, upon Defendant Sonic Imports, Inc. served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nader Farargi, Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bjorgum, A)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Sonic Imports, Inc. (car)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Docket item 7 should be disregarded. Form was issued in error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - form #7 (car)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Kiraco, LLC, Albert Kirakosian. (Bjorgum, A)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kiraco, LLC, Albert Kirakosian, (Bjorgum, A)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by plaintiff Kiraco, LLC, Albert Kirakosian. (Bjorgum, A)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kiraco, LLC, Albert Kirakosian. (Bjorgum, A)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23237342 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Albert Kirakosian, Kiraco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Patent, #2 Exhibit B Plaintiff's product, #3 Exhibit C Plaintiff's Tradermarks, #4 Exhibit D Plaintiff's packaging, #5 Exhibit E Infringing Products and Packaing) (Attorney A Eric Bjorgum added to party Kiraco, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney A Eric Bjorgum added to party Albert Kirakosian(pty:pla))(Bjorgum, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert Kirakosian et al v. Sonic Imports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Kirakosian
Represented By: A Eric Bjorgum
Represented By: Marc Karish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiraco, LLC
Represented By: A Eric Bjorgum
Represented By: Marc Karish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Jason S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?