Shonna Counter v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shonna Counter
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01282
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Edgar Cruz in place of attorney Melissa T. Daugherty filed by Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vanlochem, Lauren)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lauren Rebecca Vanlochem counsel for Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. Melissa T. Daugherty and Lauren R. Vanlochem is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Vanlochem, Lauren)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sara Gunderson counsel for Plaintiff Shonna Counter. Adding Sara Gunderson as counsel of record for Shonna Counter for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(Attorney Sara Gunderson added to party Shonna Counter(pty:pla))(Gunderson, Sara)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Cruz, Edgar)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC.(Attorney Edgar Cruz added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft))(Cruz, Edgar)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, (Vanlochem, Lauren)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC answer now due 4/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC.(Attorney Lauren Rebecca Vanlochem added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft))(Vanlochem, Lauren)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, upon Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process - C T CORPORATION SYSTEM / Carlos Paz - Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cch)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (et)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Carson, Chris)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, (Carson, Chris)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Carson, Chris)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23246749 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Shonna Counter(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shonna Counter v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonna Counter
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Sara Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Rebecca Vanlochem
Represented By: Melissa T Daugherty
Represented By: Edgar Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?