Terence M. Magrath et al v. Medtronic Minimed, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terence M. Magrath, Michael T. Magrath and Kayla M Magrath
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv01344
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING OF THE CASE AND FOR STAY OF RULE 26(f) DEADLINES by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, #17 . Case stayed. Defendant Medtronic's answer is due 7/19/2019. (mrgo)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Defendant Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JOSEPH P. CERONSKY IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING OF THE CASE AND FOR STAY OF RULE 26(f) DEADLINES, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING OF THE CASE AND FOR STAY OF RULE 26(f) DEADLINES)(Attorney Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott added to party Medtronic Minimed, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pigott, Ginger)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Nicole E. Narotzky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Medtronic, Inc., designating Ginger Pigott as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P. Ceronsky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Medtronic, Inc., designating Ginger Pigott as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney on behalf of Defendant Medtronic, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (ak)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for April 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f)Report shall be filed with the Court no later than April 4, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (shb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials BeforeJudge George H. Wu. See order for further details. (shb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole E. Narotzky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Medtronic, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23320972) filed by Defendant Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pigott, Ginger)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P. Ceronsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Medtronic, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23320818) filed by Defendant Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pigott, Ginger)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Judah A Druck. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P Ceronsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nicole E Narotzky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
February 22, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Terence M. Magrath, Michael T. Magrath, Kayla M Magrath. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/3/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 served on 02/22/2019. (Pigott, Ginger)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., identifying Medtronic, Inc.. (Pigott, Ginger)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEETS-FILED as NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV00345 with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 02/22/2019, receipt number 26FJU78T), filed by Defendant Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc..(Pigott, Ginger) Modified on 2/26/2019 (ghap).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV00345 Receipt No: 0973-23257889 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Complaint) (Attorney Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott added to party Medtronic Minimed, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pigott, Ginger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terence M. Magrath et al v. Medtronic Minimed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence M. Magrath
Represented By: James G O'Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Magrath
Represented By: James G O'Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla M Magrath
Represented By: James G O'Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Represented By: Nicole E Narotzky
Represented By: Joseph P Ceronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc.
Represented By: Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?