BlackBerry Limited v. Twitter, Inc.

Plaintiff: BlackBerry Limited
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01444
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, upon Defendant Twitter, Inc. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Asperger, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. See order for details. (shb)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-01844 GW(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01444 GW(KSx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Twitter, Inc. (ghap)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-1844-GW(KSx), 2:18-cv-02693-GW(KSx) (Asperger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited (Asperger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited, (Asperger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Asperger, James)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23284161 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Attorney James R Asperger added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:pla))(Asperger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BlackBerry Limited v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BlackBerry Limited
Represented By: James R Asperger
Represented By: Yury Kapgan
Represented By: Jordan R Jaffe
Represented By: Edward R McGah, Jr
Represented By: Victoria F Maroulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?