Higueral Produce, Inc. v. RRD Produce Co. et al

Plaintiff: Higueral Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Baudelio Villalobos, Ricardo Villalobos, RRD Produce Co., Maricruz Villalobos and Raul P. Gomez
Case Number: 2:2019cv01544
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Raul P. Gomez, RRD Produce Co., Ricardo Villalobos filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Cartee, Anthony)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before May 6, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for details.) (sbou)
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc., upon Defendant Baudelio Villalobos served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Baudelio Villalobos in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
April 17, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc., upon Defendant Raul P. Gomez served on 4/7/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Raul P. Gomez in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc., upon Defendant Maricruz Villalobos served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maricruz Villalobos in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc., upon Defendant Ricardo Villalobos served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ricardo Villalobos in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc., upon Defendant RRD Produce Co. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ricardo Villalobos, authorized agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cartee, Anthony)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Raul P. Gomez. (sbou)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ricardo Villalobos. (sbou)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maricruz Villalobos. (sbou)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Baudelio Villalobos. (sbou)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RRD Produce Co.. (sbou)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons (BV), #2 Request for Summons (MV), #3 Request for Summons (RG), #4 Request for Summons (RV))(Cartee, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc. (Cartee, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 (Local Rule 7.1-1) Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc., (Cartee, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons (B.Villalobos), #2 Proposed Summons (M.Villalobos), #3 Proposed Summons (R.Gomez), #4 Proposed Summons (R.Villalobos))(Cartee, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc.. (Cartee, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23307137 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Higueral Produce, Inc.. (Attorney Anthony B Cartee added to party Higueral Produce, Inc.(pty:pla))(Cartee, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higueral Produce, Inc. v. RRD Produce Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baudelio Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRD Produce Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricruz Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul P. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Higueral Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony B Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?