Pacific Bell Telephone Company et al v. Gustavo Chavez
Petitioner: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Respondent: Gustavo Chavez
Undetermined: Communications Workers of America, District 9
Case Number: 2:2019cv01562
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, #26 , by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court hereby APPROVES the Stipulation. It is ordered that thisaction is dismissed with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. In light of the Stipulation, all dates and deadlines are vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulated Request for Dismissal)(Brown, Elizabeth)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Brown, Elizabeth)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christina Louise Adams on behalf of Respondent Gustavo Chavez, Real Party In Interest Defendant Communications Workers of America, District 9 (Attorney Christina Louise Adams added to party Gustavo Chavez(pty:res), Attorney Christina Louise Adams added to party Communications Workers of America, District 9(pty:rpid))(Adams, Christina)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE RESPONDENT'S AND REAL PROPERTY IN INTEREST'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION (DKT. #16 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion will be heard on June 17, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10B of the First Street Courthouse. The Clerk shall terminate the hearing set before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Dkt. 16. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY.
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; NO HEARING: UNDER SUBMISSION. Joint Report Due: 5/10/2019 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV19-01562 JAK (SKx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials CBM on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /Petition Under Rule 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) #16 (Amended Re New Hearing Date) filed by Respondent Gustavo Chavez, Real Party In Interest Defendant Communications Workers of America, District 9. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guizar, Monica)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01562 JAK(SKx). (rn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case /Petition Under Rule 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Respondent; Real Party In Interest Communications Workers of America, District 9 Gustavo Chavez, Communications Workers of America, District 9. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 8:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Gustavo Chavez ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Guizar, Monica) Modified on 4/4/2019 (yl).
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica Teresa Guizar counsel for Respondent Gustavo Chavez, Real Party In Interest Defendant Communications Workers of America, District 9. Adding Monica T. Guizar as counsel of record for Respondent Gustavo Chavez; Real Party In Interest Communications Workers of America, District 9 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent and Real Party In Interest Gustavo Chavez and Communications Workers of America, District 9. (Attorney Monica Teresa Guizar added to party Gustavo Chavez(pty:res), Attorney Monica Teresa Guizar added to party Communications Workers of America, District 9(pty:rpid))(Guizar, Monica)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company, re Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #12 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #13 served on March 21, 2019. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01562 CBM(SKx). (rn)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by respondent Pacific Bell Telephone Company, re Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program, #9 served on March 14, 2019. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by respondent Pacific Bell Telephone Company, re Statement #8 served on March 6, 2019. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-01562 CAS (SKx). (mrgo)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (jtil)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Notice of Lodging #4 , Declaration #3 served on March 4, 2019. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order To Show Cause Re Contempt re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Show Cause Re Contempt)(Brown, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Yu re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Brown re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Brown, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Order to Show Cause Re Contempt Receipt No: 0973-23310617 - Fee: $400, filed by petitioner Pacific Bell Telephone Company. (Attorney Elizabeth Alexandra Brown added to party Pacific Bell Telephone Company(pty:pet))(Brown, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Bell Telephone Company et al v. Gustavo Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Communications Workers of America, District 9
Represented By: Monica Teresa Guizar
Represented By: Francisco Manuel Alejandro Delgado
Represented By: Christina Louise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gustavo Chavez
Represented By: Monica Teresa Guizar
Represented By: Francisco Manuel Alejandro Delgado
Represented By: Christina Louise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pacific Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Alexandra Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?