United States of America et al v. Broker Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Malou Tutanes-Luster and United States of America
Defendant: Patty Arvielo and Broker Solutions Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01630
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Patrick Ofak. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lindsay Lombard Buchanan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Lingle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laina M. Herbert. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kyle J. McGee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan W. Ferris. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nelson J. Thomas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
March 7, 2019 Filing 55 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
March 6, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:17-cv-04384-JST, from U.S. District Court California Northern District (San Francisco). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-01630-PSG (JPRx). (lh)
March 4, 2019 case electronically transmitted to Central District of California. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #40 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 Letter from Laina M. Herbert to Judge Tigar in Response to Order Vacating Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Malou Tutanes-Luster)(Herbert, Laina) (Filed on 2/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Broker Solutions, Inc., re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California filed by Broker Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 5, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ) filed byBroker Solutions, Inc. (Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 1/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY (re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California ) filed byBroker Solutions, Inc. (Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 1/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 49 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint ) filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-18)(McGee, Kyle) (Filed on 1/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California) filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. (McGee, Kyle) (Filed on 1/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12985520) filed by Broker Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Buchanan, Lindsay) (Filed on 1/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12985488) filed by Broker Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ofak, Timothy) (Filed on 1/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 43 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Broker Solutions, Inc. (Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 1/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 42 Declaration of Joshua A. Rosenthal in Support of #40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California filed byBroker Solutions, Inc. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Rosenthal, Joshua) (Filed on 1/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Broker Solutions, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/17/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 1/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Central District of California filed by Broker Solutions, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/17/2019. Replies due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 1/3/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Patty Arvielo by Malou Tutanes-Luster (McGee, Kyle) (Filed on 1/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KYLE J. MCGEE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LAINA M. HERBERT PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kimberly Friday (Friday, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12955649) filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Herbert, Laina) (Filed on 12/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12955638) filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGee, Kyle) (Filed on 12/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Brooks Cutter and John R. Parker, Jr. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 12/26/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Relator's Complaint re #23 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Patty Arvielo, Broker Solutions, Inc. (Rosenthal, Joshua) (Filed on 12/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Abram Rosenthal (Rosenthal, Joshua) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Broker Solutions, Inc (Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patty Arvielo, Broker Solutions, Inc.. (Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchel Howard Kider (Kider, Mitchel) (Filed on 12/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. Service waived by Patty Arvielo waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Ferris, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. Service waived by Broker Solutions, Inc waiver sent on 10/23/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Ferris, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Chang (Chang, Douglas) (Filed on 11/1/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Patty Arvielo. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Broker Solutions, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. (Ferris, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. (Ferris, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Request to Keep Case Under Partial Seal and Unsealing Case by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Stipulation and Request for Enlargement of Time to Elect or Decline Intervention signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #12 Stipulation. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 15 [PROPOSED] ORDER TO UNSEAL; by United States of America. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; by United States of America re #13 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION; by United States of America (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ELECT OR DECLINE INTERVENTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by United States of America. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: #1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Stipulation and Request for Enlargement of Time to Elect or Decline Intervention signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #10 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2018: #1 certificate of service) (shyS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Enlargement of Time to Elect or Decline Intervention filed by United States of America. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
December 29, 2017 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT filed by United States of America. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
November 7, 2017 Filing 8 Mail sent to David Chang returned as undeliverable re #7 Order. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Request to Vacate Case Management Dates signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malou Tutanes-Luster. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 4 Declaration of ANNETTE M. GIFFORD in Support of #3 Administrative Motion to File Complaint Under Seal; filed byMalou Tutanes-Luster. (Related document(s) #3 ) (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Complaint Under Seal; filed by Malou Tutanes-Luster. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2017: #1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/2/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 1 QUI TAM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); against Broker Solutions, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00 Paid. Receipt Number 34611126464). Filed by United States of America. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2017. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2017: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2017: #2 Receipt) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Broker Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Arvielo
Represented By: Mitchel Howard Kider
Represented By: Joshua A Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broker Solutions Inc
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Ofak
Represented By: Mitchel Howard Kider
Represented By: Joshua A Rosenthal
Represented By: Lindsay Lombard Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malou Tutanes-Luster
Represented By: Michael J Lingle
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: John R Parker, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan W Ferris
Represented By: Laina M Herbert
Represented By: Nelson J Thomas
Represented By: Annette M Gifford
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kimberly Friday
Represented By: Douglas K. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?