Alex Morgan et al v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc. Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by the players of the United States Women's National Soccer Team for, among other things, pay equity filed against U.S. Soccer.

Plaintiff: Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Rose Lavelle, Crystal Dunn, Danielle Colaprico, Casey Short, Merritt Mathias, Kelley OHara, Jessica McDonald, McCall Zerboni, Mallory Pugh, Tierna Davidson, Carli Lloyd, Tobin Heath, Morgan Brian, Christen Press, Lindsey Horan, Ashlyn Harris, Abby Dahlkemper, Jane Campbell, Emily Sonnett, Samantha Mewis, Adrianna Franch, Julie Ertz, Andi Sullivan, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher and Allie Long
Defendant: United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
Interested Party: Richard M. Nichols
Intervenor: Stephen P Wallace
Case Number: 2:2019cv01717
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [DE #317 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiffs' Motion for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #317 , calendared for hearing on 7/25/2022, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 22, 2022 Filing 317 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Richard M. Nichols, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. The parties' joint motion for a limited remand under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12(b)(1) is granted. This proceeding is remanded to the district court for the sole purpose of considering the parties' settlement. [See document for more details.] (mat)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING #315 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby issues an indicative ruling under FRCP 62.1(a)(3) stating that it would grant the parties' motion for preliminary approval if the Ninth Circuit remands for that purpose or that the preliminary approval motion raises a substantial issue. (jp)
May 20, 2022 Filing 315 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Ruling Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 6/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. The parties joint motion to remove this appeal from the oral argument calendar and to place this appeal in abeyance is granted. Oral argument in this matter, scheduled for March 7, 2022, at 1:00 p.m., in Pasadena, California, is vacated. Further proceedings are stayed pending finalization of the terms of the parties settlement in principle. [see document for all details.](mat)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #308 filed by Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Emily Sonnett, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Mallory Pugh, Samantha Mewis, Abby Dahlkemper, Kelley OHara, Tierna Davidson, Ashlyn Harris, Morgan Brian, Rose Lavelle, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Jane Campbell, Megan Rapinoe, Alex Morgan, Casey Short, Andi Sullivan, Adrianna Franch, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Julie Ertz. CCA # 21-55356. Appellants unopposed motion to file under seal Volume 7 of the excerpts of record is granted. The Clerk will file publicly the opening brief, Volumes 1 through 6 of the excerpts of record, and the motion to seal. The Clerk will file under seal Volume 7 of the excerpts of record. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. (jp)
May 14, 2021 Filing 312 NOTICE : Certificate Regarding Transcript filed by plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2021 Filing 311 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian D Netter counsel for Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Brian D. Netter is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Carli Lloyd, Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Netter, Brian)
April 14, 2021 Filing 310 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55356 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 as to Plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (iv)
April 14, 2021 Filing 309 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #308 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Saharsky, Nicole)
April 14, 2021 Filing 308 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Appeal of Judgment, #305 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31112139.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saharsky, Nicole)
April 14, 2021 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian D Netter on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Morgan Brian(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Jane Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Danielle Colaprico(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Abby Dahlkemper(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Tierna Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Crystal Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Julie Ertz (pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Adrianna Franch(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Ashlyn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Lindsey Horan(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Rose Lavelle(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Allie Long (pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Merritt Mathias(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Jessica McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Alyssa Naeher(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Kelley OHara(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Christen Press(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Mallory Pugh(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Casey Short(pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Emily Sonnett (pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party Andi Sullivan (pty:pla), Attorney Brian D Netter added to party McCall Zerboni(pty:pla))(Netter, Brian)
April 14, 2021 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole A. Saharsky on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Morgan Brian(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Jane Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Danielle Colaprico(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Abby Dahlkemper(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Tierna Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Crystal Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Julie Ertz (pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Adrianna Franch(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Ashlyn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Lindsey Horan(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Rose Lavelle(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Allie Long (pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Merritt Mathias(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Jessica McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Alyssa Naeher(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Kelley OHara(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Christen Press(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Mallory Pugh(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Casey Short(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Emily Sonnett (pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party Andi Sullivan (pty:pla), Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky added to party McCall Zerboni(pty:pla))(Saharsky, Nicole)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, the Court GRANTS the motion in its entirety. The Court APPROVES the parties' proposed Class Action Settlement and Release of Working Conditions Claims. The Court ENTERS final judgment in this case, including on Plaintiffs' Equal pay Act and Title VII pay-discrimination claims. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (See Order for further specifics). (jp)
April 12, 2021 Filing 304 MINUTES OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT #297 held before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Court and counsel confer. No objections have been made and there are no objectors present. The Court grants the motion. Court Reporter: Sherri Kleeger. (bm)
March 18, 2021 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Document,, #302 served on March 18, 2021. (Tsukerman, Lev)
March 18, 2021 Filing 302 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #297 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #301 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni.(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #295 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File UInder Seal is GRANTED. See order for further details. (shb)
March 15, 2021 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #296 served on March 15, 2021. (Tsukerman, Lev)
March 15, 2021 Filing 299 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #298 served on March 15, 2021. (Gragert, Sarah)
March 15, 2021 Filing 298 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #295 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Gragert, Sarah)
March 15, 2021 Filing 297 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Exhibit A to Kessler Decl (Redacted), #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #4 Proposed Judgment on Plaintiffs' Pay-Discrimination Claims) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2021 Filing 296 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #295 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
March 15, 2021 Filing 295 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Due to the unavailability of jurors during this pandemic, the Pretrial Conference is continued to May 24, 2021 at 9:00 a.m., and the Jury Trial is continued to June 15, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [DE #276 ]; Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment [DE #277 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and provisionally certifies the class. The Final Approval Hearing is hereby calendared for April 12, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. The Court also conditionally GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Pa1tial Final Judgment once the settlement has been officially approved. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Motion for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and of Class Notice #276 ; and Motion for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Partial Final Judgment) filed by Plaintiffs #277 , calendared for hearing on January 4, 2021, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Because of the unavailability of jurors during this pandemic, the Pretrial Conference is continued to March 1, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., and the Jury Trial is continued to March 9, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2020 Filing 290 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Stay All Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2020 Filing 289 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Document,, #288 served on 12/04/2020. (Tsukerman, Lev)
December 4, 2020 Filing 288 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey L. Kessler #276 re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and of Class Notice #276 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #287 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni.(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED UNOPPOSED APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #282 by Judge R. Gary Klausner (lc)
December 2, 2020 Filing 286 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #283 served on 12/02/2020. (Tsukerman, Lev)
December 2, 2020 Filing 285 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #284 served on 12/02/2020. (Gragert, Sarah)
December 2, 2020 Filing 284 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Corrected APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal #282 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Gragert, Sarah)
December 2, 2020 Filing 283 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Corrected APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal #282 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 2, 2020 Filing 282 Corrected APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Corrected Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 281 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal #274 is DENIED. Declaration does not contain citations to the applicable legal standard. L.R. 79-5.2.2(a)(i). The unredacted version of the documents do not highlight the proposed redactions. L.R. 79-5.2.2(a)(iv). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 1, 2020 Filing 280 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,, #275 served on 12/01/2020. (Tsukerman, Lev)
December 1, 2020 Filing 279 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #278 served on 12/01/2020. (Gragert, Sarah)
December 1, 2020 Filing 278 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal #274 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Gragert, Sarah)
December 1, 2020 Filing 277 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Partial Final Judgment) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Rule 54(b) Consent Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Filing 276 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and of Class Notice filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Filing 275 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal #274 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 1, 2020 Filing 274 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval under seal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal, #2 Redacted Document Exhibit A to Kessler Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Deadlines [DE #272 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES as moot the parties' stipulation. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 272 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Continue Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wine, Jamie)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Because of the unavailability of jurors during this pandemic, the Court will only be able to conduct bench trials at this time. Consequently, the Pretrial Conference is continued to January 11, 2021 at 9:00 a.m., and the Jury Trial is continued to January 26, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. If the parties wish to proceed with a bench trial on the current trial date of September 15, 2020, a stipulation to waive jury should be filed no later than August 6, 2020.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #268 Non-Resident Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Tobin Heath, Carli Lloyd, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel. (et)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #267 Non-Resident Attorney Brian D Netter APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Tobin Heath, Carli Lloyd, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel. (jp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 268 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole A. Saharsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Tobin Heath, Carli Lloyd, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27052673) filed by Plaintiffs Tobin Heath, Carli Lloyd, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
July 2, 2020 Filing 267 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian D. Netter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Tobin Heath, Carli Lloyd, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27052499) filed by Plaintiffs Tobin Heath, Carli Lloyd, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment [DE #253 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court therefore DENIES Plaintiffs' request for Rule 54(b) certification. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) #253 , calendared for hearing on June 8, 2020 has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Amendment to Plaintiffs' Witness List and Exhibit List Notice #263 , was filed after the motion cut-off date ordered by the Court. The Court will construe the document an objection and will not place the matter on the Court's motion calendar. (jp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 263 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Amendment to Plaintiffs' Witness List and Exhibit List Notice (Other),,, #249 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wine, Jamie)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Joint Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Deadlines #257 . THE STIPULATION IS DENIED AS MOOT. (jp)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Pretrial Deadlines #260 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the deadline for the Parties to file oppositions to Motions in Limine will be 8/7/2020, with Parties' replies thereto due 8/21/2020. (jp)
May 20, 2020 Filing 260 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Petrial Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) #253 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Wine, Jamie)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE JUNE 16, 2020 TRIAL PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS RULE 54(b) MOTION AND ANY APPEAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (yl)
May 15, 2020 Filing 257 STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wine, Jamie)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Pretrial Conference is HEREBY CONTINUED to 08/31/2020 at 9:00 am; and the Jury Trial is HEREBY CONTINUED to 09/15/2020 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2020 Filing 255 STATEMENT Regarding Pending Motions filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni Joint Statement Regarding Pending Motions re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #251 . (Kessler, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 254 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Re: June 16, 2020 Trial Pending The Resolution Of Plaintiffs' Rule 54(b) Motion and Any Appeal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #2 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
May 8, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Entry of Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
May 4, 2020 Filing 252 OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (No. 5) to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Caren Goldberg #240 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, Interested Party Richard M. Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Leiden, #2 Exhibit 1 to Leiden Decl)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Outstanding Motions by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The parties shall file a joint statement not to exceed 5 pages no later than 5/15/2020. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [DE #170 ; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [DE #171 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion and GRANTS in part Defendant's Motion. Plaintiffs' Title VII claim for discriminatory working conditions survives only insofar as it is based on (1) travel conditions (specifically charter flights and hotel accommodations), and (2) personnel and support services (specifically, medical and training support). (jp)
May 1, 2020 Filing 249 NOTICE filed by plaintiffs' Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Notice of Amendment to Plaintiffs' Witness List and Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, #2 Exhibit 1 to Jeanifer E. Parsigian Declaration [Email Exchange Ending with March 26, 2020 Email], #3 Exhibit 2 to Jeanifer E. Parsigian Declaration [Email Exchange Ending with April 8, 2020 Email], #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit 233)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 248 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Document,, #244 , Sealed Document,,,,,,, #245 served on 4/17/2020. (Leiden, Diana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (11) to Preclude Defendant From Relying On 29 U.S.C 213(f) As A Defense To Plaintiffs' Equal Pay Act Claims filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, #2 Exhibit 22 - Expert Opinion Second Supplemental Report of Carlyn Irwin, #3 Exhibit 23 - Carlyn Irwin Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #4 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Changes to Case Deadlines #242 by Judge R. Gary Klausner, the Court grants the Parties' Joint Stipulation that: (1) Plaintiffs may file an additional motion in limine addressing Defendant'sdefense that Plaintiffs' Equal Pay Act "claims are barred, in whole or in part, to the extent that certain workweeks were performed entirely within foreign countries" on 4/17/2020, and opposition and reply deadlines shall be the same as the Parties other motions in limine; (2) Plaintiffs will serve objections to Defendant's jury instructions on 5/19/2020; (3) The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to Defendant's motionin limine regarding Dr. Goldberg's testimony will be May 4, 2020 andthe deadline for Defendant to file its Reply thereto will be 5/26/2020;and (4) The deadline for the Parties to file oppositions to all other motions inlimine will be 5/15/2020. (jp)
April 17, 2020 Filing 245 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 35, 36, 37, 38, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61, and 64 to the Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #243 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 35), #2 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 36), #3 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 37), #4 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 38), #5 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 40), #6 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 41), #7 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 42), #8 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 43), #9 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 44), #10 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 45), #11 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 46), #12 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 48), #13 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 50), #14 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 51), #15 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 52), #16 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 53), #17 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 54), #18 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 55), #19 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 56), #20 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 57), #21 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 58), #22 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 59), #23 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 60), #24 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 61), #25 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 64))(Leiden, Diana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 244 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #243 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni.(Leiden, Diana)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Application to File Under Seal #184 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 14, 2020 Filing 242 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Changes to Case Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2020 Filing 241 DECLARATION of Wesley J. Horton in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (No. 5) to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Caren Goldberg #240 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Caren Goldberg, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Expert Report of Caren Goldberg, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript of Caren Goldberg, #4 Exhibit 4 - Morgan Deposition, Exhibit 9, Charge of Discrimination, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of Proceedings in Prentice v. OfficeMax North America, Inc., #6 Exhibit 6 - Order in Ravina v. Columbia University, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition Transcript of Jay Berhalter, #8 Exhibit 8 - Deposition Transcript of Carlos Cordeiro)(Horton, Wesley)
April 13, 2020 Filing 240 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (No. 5) to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Caren Goldberg filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wine, Jamie)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Joint Ex Parte Application for Order for Guidance Regarding Case Schedule [DE #232 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court ORDERS as follows: (1) The 4/20/2020 Pretrial Conference is continued until 6/1/2020. (2) The 5/5/2020 Trial Date is continued until 6/16/2020. (jp)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #234 Non-Resident Attorney Sarah M Gragert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Michele D Johnson as local counsel. (jp)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #233 Non-Resident Attorney kuan Huang APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Michele D Johnson as local counsel. (jp)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation Clarifying the Summary Judgment Record #230 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Jamie Lynne Wine for Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., in place and stead of Brian M Stolzenbach, Chantelle C Egan, Cheryl A Luce, Ellen E McLaughlin, Giovanna A Ferrari, Kyllan B Kershaw, Noah A Finkel, Sharilee K Smentek, and Kristen M Peters of Seyfarth Shaw, LLP #229 . (jp)
April 7, 2020 Filing 234 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sarah M. Gragert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26004878) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Michele)
April 7, 2020 Filing 233 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kuan Huang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26004817) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Michele)
April 7, 2020 Filing 232 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Guidance Regarding Case Schedule filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2020 Filing 231 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs [Redacted Joint Witness List] Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni.. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 230 Joint STIPULATION to Clarify The Summary Judgment Record filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 229 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Seyfarth Shaw as counsel of record filed by defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Joint Application to Seal [DE 226] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS in part the Joint Application #226 . (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 227 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Joint APPLICATION to file document redacted version of the parties' Joint Witness List under seal #226 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document (Exhibit A - Joint Witness List))(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2020 Filing 226 Joint APPLICATION to file document redacted version of the parties' Joint Witness List under seal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document (Exhibit A - Joint Witness List))(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2020 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Wine, Jamie)
March 30, 2020 Filing 224 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni.. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2020 Filing 223 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2020 Filing 222 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Richard M. Nichols, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan.. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The following motions, on calendar for hearing on March 30, 2020, have been taken off the motion calendar and under submission: Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #170 ; Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims #171 ; and Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony #167 . No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Emergency Motion to Intervene by Stephen P.Wallace by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DENIES Wallace's ex parte application #219 . "An ex parte application is a means of obtaining extraordinary relief and is appropriate in only rare circumstances." Wallace has failed to demonstrate that his request for relief "cannot be calendared in the usual manner." (jp)
March 20, 2020 Filing 218 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence of Sum Revenues #202 , MOTION IN LIMINE (10) to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony #216 , MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude Testimony And Argument About Plaintiffs' NWSL-Related Compensation #206 , MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude Defendant's Late Disclosed Witnesses #211 , MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude Justifications Based On Non-Job-Related "Factors Other Than Sex" #214 , MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To CBA And Negotiations As A Defense To EPA And Title VII Liability #207 , MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To Payments By Third Parties To Plaintiffs #205 , MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Preclude Use Of USSF Payments To Union To Argue Payments Are Wages To Plaintiffs #203 , MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Preclude Reference To USSF's Non-Profit Status #209 , MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To Other International Soccer Team Payments #215 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine Nos. 1-10)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 217 DECLARATION of Jeanifer E. Parsigian in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence of Sum Revenues #202 , MOTION IN LIMINE (10) to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony #216 , MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude Testimony And Argument About Plaintiffs' NWSL-Related Compensation #206 , MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude Defendant's Late Disclosed Witnesses #211 , MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude Justifications Based On Non-Job-Related "Factors Other Than Sex" #214 , MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To CBA And Negotiations As A Defense To EPA And Title VII Liability #207 , MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To Payments By Third Parties To Plaintiffs #205 , MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Preclude Use Of USSF Payments To Union To Argue Payments Are Wages To Plaintiffs #203 , MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Preclude Reference To USSF's Non-Profit Status #209 , MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To Other International Soccer Team Payments #215 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Jay Berhalter 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Collective Bargaining Meeting Notes, #3 Exhibit 3 - EEOC Letter dated 5-31-2016, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tom King 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sunil Gulati 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2017-2021 Collective Bargaining Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2011-2018 Collective Bargaining Agreement, #8 Exhibit 8 - Alex Morgan Deposition Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9 - Megan Rapinoe Deposition Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2013-2016 MOU, #11 Exhibit 11 - Sunil Gulati Deposition Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 12 - Philip Miscimarra Expert Report, #13 Exhibit 13 - Jay Berhalter Deposition Excerpts, #14 Exhibit 14 - USSF's Proposed Witness List, #15 Exhibit 15 - USSF's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, #16 Exhibit 16 - Email Correspondence dated January 15-20, 2020, #17 Exhibit 17 - USSF's Amended and Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, #18 Exhibit 18 - Justin McCrary Expert Report dated 3-6-2020, #19 Exhibit 19 - Justin McCrary Expert Report dated 2-2-2020, #20 Exhibit 20 - Carlyn Irwin Expert Report, #21 21 - USSF's Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 216 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (10) to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 215 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (9) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To Other International Soccer Team Payments filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 214 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (8) to Preclude Justifications Based On Non-Job-Related "Factors Other Than Sex" filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Wesley J. Horton in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (No. 4) to Exclude Evidence and Argument at Trial Related to Unpled Allegations of Disparate Forms of Discrimination #208 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Deposition of Alex Morgan, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Deposition of Kelley O'Hara)(Horton, Wesley)
March 20, 2020 Filing 212 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Testimony of Dr. Finnie Cook filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cook Report, #2 Exhibit B - Cook Rebuttal Report, #3 Proposed Order)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 211 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude Defendant's Late Disclosed Witnesses filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 210 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Pre-2012 Negotiations and Langels 2004 Complaint and Documents Referenced Therein filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Exhibit 56, #2 Exhibit B - John Langel Deposition Excerpt at p. 48, #3 Exhibit C - John Langel Deposition Excerpts at pp. 250-253, 259-262, #4 Exhibit D - Exhibit Langel-40, #5 Proposed Order)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 209 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Preclude Reference To USSF's Non-Profit Status filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (No. 4) to Exclude Evidence and Argument at Trial Related to Unpled Allegations of Disparate Forms of Discrimination filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wine, Jamie)
March 20, 2020 Filing 207 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To CBA And Negotiations As A Defense To EPA And Title VII Liability filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 206 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude Testimony And Argument About Plaintiffs' NWSL-Related Compensation filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 205 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Preclude Evidence Of Or Reference To Payments By Third Parties To Plaintiffs filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of Head Coaches' Salaries filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wine, Jamie)
March 20, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Preclude Use Of USSF Payments To Union To Argue Payments Are Wages To Plaintiffs filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 202 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence of Sum Revenues filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING The Stipulation Re: Expert Depostions of Dr. Robert Noll and Caren Goldberg, Ph.D., and Defendant's Deadline to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony #193 by Judge R. Gary Klausner as follows: (1) The deposition of Plaintiffs expert Dr. Robert Noll will take place after the 4/3/2020 expert discovery deadline on 4/21/2020. (2) The deposition of Plaintiffs expert Caren Goldberg, Ph.D. will take place after the 4/3/2020 expert discovery deadline on or before 4/9/2020; and (3) The filing deadline for Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony be extended from 3/20/2020 to 4/13/2020, and Plaintiffs' Opposition thereto from 4/10/2020 to 4/17/2020. (jp)
March 19, 2020 Filing 200 Text Only Entry: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for defendant shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry 193 (to the Judge's generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 16, 2020 Filing 219 EMERGENCY MOTIONS to Intervene by "USA, ex rel; Stephen P Wallace, aka Private Attorney General", and for a Temporary Stay While President Donald J. Trump Reviews Case for Settlement via an Executive Order, with Brief in support filed by Intervenor Stephen P Wallace. (jp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 199 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. correcting Reply (Motion related),,,,, #197 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 198 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims #171 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Reply To Statement of Genuine Disputes, #2 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections, #3 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Rebecca Roux, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections)(Wine, Jamie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 197 REPLY In Support of A Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses #170 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Objections, #2 Supplemental Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Statement of Additional Genuine Disputes, #4 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #5 Exhibit 65 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration - Washington Post Article, #6 Exhibit 66 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration - The New York Times Article, #7 Exhibit 67 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration - Carlos Cordeiro Letter, #8 Exhibit 68 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration - Rebecca Roux Deposition Excerpts)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 196 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michele D Johnson counsel for Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Adding Michele D. Johnson as counsel of record for Defendant United States Soccer Federation Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation Inc.. (Attorney Michele D Johnson added to party United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (pty:dft))(Johnson, Michele)
March 16, 2020 Filing 195 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jamie L Wine counsel for Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Adding Jamie L. Wine as counsel of record for Defendant United States Soccer Federation Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation Inc.. (Attorney Jamie L Wine added to party United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (pty:dft))(Wine, Jamie)
March 16, 2020 Filing 194 REPLY In Support of A Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony #167 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, #2 Exhibit 7 to Jeanifer E. Parsigian Declaration - Excerpts of Appendix E)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2020 Filing 193 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation Re: Expert Depositions of Dr. Robert Noll and Caren Goldberg, Ph.D., and Defendant's Deadline to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 192 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #186 Errata to Exhibit 1 of Carlyn Irwin's Second Declaration in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Errata - Corrected Exhibit 1 to Carlyn Irwin Second Declaration)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 191 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims #171 Errata to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Errata - O'Hara Transcript Excerpts)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 13, 2020 Filing 190 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 35, 36, 37, 38, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61 and 64 to the Further Declaration o #184 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 10, 2020 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,,, #185 served on 3/9/2020 and 3/10/2020. (Leiden, Diana)
March 9, 2020 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony #167 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Egan Decl. ISO Opposition to Mtn to Exclude Expert Testimony, #2 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Egan Decl., #3 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Egan Decl., #4 Exhibit Exh. 3 to Egan Decl., #5 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Egan Decl., #6 Exhibit Exh. 5 to Egan Decl., #7 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Egan Decl. Exh. 5, #8 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Egan Decl. Exh. 5, #9 Exhibit Exh. 3 to Egan Decl. Exh. 5, #10 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Egan Decl. Exh. 5, #11 Exhibit Exh. 5 to Egan Decl. Exh. 5, #12 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Egan Decl., #13 Exhibit Exh. 7 to Egan Decl., #14 Exhibit Exh. 8 to Egan Decl., #15 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Mtn to Exclude Expert Testimony)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 9, 2020 Filing 187 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims #171 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes, #2 Objections to Evidence, #3 Declaration of Cardelle B. Spangler, #4 Exhibit 1 to Cardelle B. Spangler Declaration (Letter Dated August 3, 2016), #5 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #6 Exhibit 34 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration (Dr. Finnie Cook Expert Rebuttal Report), #7 Redacted Document -Exhibits 35-38 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration, #8 Exhibit 39 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration (John Langel Depo Transcript Excerpts), #9 Redacted Document -Exhibits 40-46 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration, #10 Exhibit 47 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration (Dr. Caren Goldberg Expert Report), #11 Redacted Document -Exhibit 48 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration, #12 Exhibit 49 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration (USSF 2017 Form 990), #13 Redacted Document -Exhibits 50-61 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration, #14 Exhibit 62 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration (USSF Answer to Plaintiffs' First Set Interrogatories), #15 Exhibit 63 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration (Christen Press Depo Transcript Excerpts), #16 Redacted Document -Exhibit 64 to Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration)(Leiden, Diana)
March 9, 2020 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses #170 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Def's Statement of Genuine Disputes in Respnse to Pls' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts ISO their Mtn for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Egan Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Egan Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration Gulati Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Gulati Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Gulati Decl., #7 Exhibit Exh. 3 to Gulati Decl., #8 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Gulati Decl., #9 Exhibit Exh. 5 to Gulati Decl., #10 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Gulati Decl., #11 Exhibit Exh. 7 to Gulati Decl., #12 Exhibit Exh. 8 to Gulati Decl., #13 Exhibit Exh. 9 to Gulati Decl., #14 Exhibit Exh. 10 to Gulati Decl., #15 Exhibit Exh. 11 to Gulati Decl., #16 Exhibit Exh. 12 to Gulati Decl., #17 Exhibit Exh. 13 to Gulati Decl., #18 Exhibit Exh. 14 to Gulati Decl., #19 Exhibit Exh. 15 to Gulati Decl., #20 Exhibit Exh. 15a to Gulati Decl., #21 Exhibit Exh. 16 to Gulati Decl., #22 Declaration Second Gulati Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #23 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Second Gulati Decl., #24 Declaration Hopfinger Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #25 Declaration Irwin Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #26 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Irwin Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #27 Declaration 2nd Irwin Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #28 Exhibit Exh. 1 to 2nd Irwin Decl., #29 Declaration King Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #30 Exhibit Exh. 1 to King Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #31 Exhibit Exh. 2 to King Decl., #32 Exhibit Exh. 3 to King Decl., #33 Exhibit Exh. 4 to King Decl., #34 Exhibit Exh. 5 to King Decl., #35 Exhibit Exh. 6 to King Decl., #36 Exhibit Exh. 7 to King Decl., #37 Exhibit Exh. 8 to King Decl., #38 Exhibit Exh. 9 to King Decl., #39 Exhibit Exh. 10 to King Decl., #40 Exhibit Exh. 11 to King Decl., #41 Exhibit Exh. 12 to King Decl., #42 Exhibit Exh. 13 to King Decl., #43 Exhibit Exh. 14 to King Decl., #44 Exhibit Exh. 15 to King Decl., #45 Exhibit Exh. 16 to King Decl., #46 Exhibit Exh. 17 to King Decl., #47 Exhibit Exh. 18 to King Decl., #48 Exhibit Exh. 19 to King Decl., #49 Exhibit Exh. 20 to King Decl., #50 Exhibit Exh. 21 to King Decl., #51 Declaration 2nd King Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #52 Exhibit Exh. 1 to 2nd King Decl., #53 Exhibit Exh. 2 to 2nd King Decl., #54 Declaration McCrary Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #55 Exhibit Exh. 1 to McCrary Decl., #56 Exhibit Exh. 2 to McCrary Decl., #57 Declaration Moses Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #58 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Moses Decl., #59 Declaration Raina Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #60 Declaration 2nd Raina Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #61 Declaration Sauer Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #62 Declaration Stewart Decl. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #63 Exhibit Cordeiro Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #64 Exhibit Ellis Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #65 Exhibit King Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #66 Exhibit Klingenberg Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #67 Exhibit Exh. 7 to Klingenberg Transcript Excerpts, #68 Exhibit Langel 2016 Transcript Excerpts, #69 Exhibit Langel Transcript Excerpts, #70 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #71 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #72 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #73 Exhibit Exh. 14 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #74 Exhibit Exh. 15 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #75 Exhibit Exh. 19 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #76 Exhibit Exh. 20 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #77 Exhibit Exh. 21 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #78 Exhibit Exh. 23 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #79 Exhibit Exh. 25 to Langel Transcript Excerpts, #80 Exhibit Lloyd Transcript Excerpts, #81 Exhibit Exh. 15 to Lloyd Transcript Excerpts, #82 Exhibit Morgan Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #83 Exhibit Nichols Tanscript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #84 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #85 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #86 Exhibit Exh. 8 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #87 Exhibit Exh. 10 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #88 Exhibit Exh. 12 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #89 Exhibit Exh. 17 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #90 Exhibit Exh. 19 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #91 Exhibit Exh. 31 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #92 Exhibit Exh. 33 to Nichols Tanscript Excerpts, #93 Exhibit O'Hara Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #94 Exhibit Rapinoe Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #95 Exhibit Exh. 29 to Rapinoe Transcript Excerpts, #96 Exhibit Exh. 32 to Rapino Transcript Excerpts, #97 Exhibit Roux Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #98 Exhibit Exh. 5 to Roux Transcript Excerpts, #99 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Roux Transcript Excerpts, #100 Exhibit Exh. 18 to Roux Transcript Excerpts, #101 Exhibit Exh. 19 to Roux Transcript Excerpts, #102 Exhibit Exh. 21 to Roux Transcript Excerpts, #103 Exhibit Exh. 37 to Roux Transcript Excerpts, #104 Exhibit Sauerbrunn Transcript Excerpts, #105 Exhibit Exh. 7 to Sauerbrunn Transcript Excerpts ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #106 Exhibit Exh. ISO Opposition to Pls' Mtn for Part. Summary Judgment, #107 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Pls' Mtn for Partial Summary Judgment)(Stolzenbach, Brian)
March 9, 2020 Filing 185 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 35, 36, 37, 38, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61 and 64 to the Further Declaration o #184 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's MSJ), #2 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 35), #3 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 36), #4 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 37), #5 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 38), #6 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 40), #7 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 41), #8 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 42), #9 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 43), #10 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 44), #11 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 45), #12 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 46), #13 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 48), #14 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 50), #15 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 51), #16 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 52), #17 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 53), #18 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 54), #19 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 55), #20 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 56), #21 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 57), #22 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 58), #23 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 59), #24 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 60), #25 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 61), #26 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 64))(Leiden, Diana)
March 9, 2020 Filing 184 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 35, 36, 37, 38, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 46, 48, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 58, 59, 60, 61 and 64 to the Further Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden under seal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's MSJ), #3 Redacted Document (Exhibits 35-38 to Further Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration), #4 Redacted Document (Exhibits 40-46 to Further Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration), #5 Redacted Document (Exhibit 48 to Further Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration), #6 Redacted Document (Exhibits 50-61 to Further Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration), #7 Redacted Document (Exhibit 64 to Further Diana Hughes Leiden Declaration))(Leiden, Diana)
March 5, 2020 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Document,,, #181 served on 3/4/2020. (Leiden, Diana)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Regarding the Local Rule 16-2 Pretrial Meeting of Counsel and Expert Deposition #177 by Judge R. Gary Klausner as follows: The Local Rule 16-2 pretrial meeting of counsel may take place after the current deadline of 3/11/2020 and instead, on 3/17/2020; and The deposition of Defendant's expert Dr. Justin McCrary may take place after the 4/3/2020 expert deposition deadline on 4/9/2020. (jp)
March 4, 2020 Filing 181 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 20 and 31 to the Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses #170 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #178 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 - Jay Berhalter Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 31 - Business Review Meeting Excerpts)(Leiden, Diana)
March 4, 2020 Filing 180 EXHIBIT 8, 11 and 12 to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses #170 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - Tom King Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 11 - Carlos Cordeiro Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 12 - Email dated 12/21/2017)(Leiden, Diana)
March 4, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses #170 (Attachments: #1 Corrected Plaintiffs' MSJ, #2 Corrected Plaintiffs' SUF, #3 Corrected Exhibit 32 to Diana Leiden Declaration)(Leiden, Diana)
March 3, 2020 Filing 177 STIPULATION for Order Regarding the Local Rule 16-2 Pretrial Meeting of Counsel and Expert Deposition filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leiden, Diana)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Application to Seal [DE #168 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting in part and denying in part #168 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details.) Re: Sealed Declaration in Support #169 . (sbou)
February 26, 2020 Filing 176 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni: Mediation held on August 13 and 14, 2019. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Leiden, Diana)
February 24, 2020 Filing 175 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 8, 11, 12, 20, 26, 27, 28 and 31 to the Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #168 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Designating Party's Declaration ISO Appl to file Under Seal etc.)(Smentek, Sharilee)
February 24, 2020 Filing 174 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 8, 11, 12, 20, 26, 27, 28 and 31 to the Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #168 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Smentek, Sharilee)
February 21, 2020 Filing 173 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Alex Morgan. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses #170 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 10)(Leiden, Diana)
February 21, 2020 Filing 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #169 served on 2/20/2020. (Kessler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration Gulati Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to Gulati Declaration - Britanica World Cup, #5 Exhibit 2 - to Gulati Declaration - 2010 MWC Television Audience Report, #6 Exhibit 3 to Gulati Declaration - 2014 MWC Television Audience Report, #7 Exhibit 4 to Gulati Declaration - 2018 MWC Television Audience Report, #8 Exhibit 5 to Gulati Declaration - 2011 WWC TElevision Audience Report, #9 Exhibit 6 to Gulati Declaration - 2015 WWC Television Audience Report, #10 Exhibit 7 to Gulati Declaration - 2019 WWC Television Audience Report, #11 Exhibit 8 to Gulati Declaration - 2010 Prize Money Memorandum, #12 Exhibit 9 to Gulati Declaration - 2011 Prize Money Memorandum, #13 Exhibit 10 to Gulati Declaration - 2014 Prize Money Memorandum, #14 Exhibit 11 to Gulati Declaration - 2015 Prize Money Memorandum, #15 Exhibit 12 to Gulati Declaration - 2019 Prize Money Memorandum, #16 Exhibit 13 to Gulati Declaration - 3-19-13 MOU, #17 Exhibit 14 to Gulati Declaration - 11-1-12 WNTPA Proposal, #18 Exhibit 15 to Gulati Declaration - 12-4-12 Gleason Email Financial Proposal, #19 Exhibit 15a to Gulati Declaration - 12-3-12 USSF Proposed financial Terms, #20 Exhibit 16 to Gulati Declaration - Gleason 2005-2011 Revenue, #21 Declaration Tom King Declaration, #22 Exhibit 1 to King Declaration - Men's CBA, #23 Exhibit 2 to King Declaration - Stolzenbach to Levinstein Email, #24 Exhibit 3 to King Declaration - 2005 WNT CBA, #25 Exhibit 4 to King Declaration - 3-19-13 WNTPA Executed MOU and Correspondence, #26 Exhibit 5 to King Declaration - 2017 CBA, #27 Exhibit 6 to King Declaration - 1-4-16 Nichols Email and Proposal, #28 Exhibit 7 to King Declaration - 5-9-16 AGM Budget File, #29 Exhibit 8 to King Declaration - 6-1-16 WNTPA MAG Memo, #30 Exhibit 9 to King Declaration - 7-6-16 US Soccer Proposal on Minimum Number of Games-Players, #31 Exhibit 10 to King Declaration - USSF Produced Version of WNTPA 2-8-17 Compensation Proposal, #32 Exhibit 11 to King Declaration - USSFs 2-9 Comp Proposal, #33 Exhibit 12 to King Declaration - Proposed Partnership Bnus, #34 Exhibit 13 to King Declaration - WNTPA 2-14 Comp Proposal, #35 Exhibit 14 to King Declaration - WNTPA 2-15 Comp Proposal, #36 Exhibit 15 to King Declaration - WNTPA 3-9 Comp Proposal, #37 Exhibit 16 to King Declaration - 3-16 USSF Financial Proposal, #38 Exhibit 17 to King Declaration - 3-29 WNTPA Financial Proposal, #39 Exhibit 18 to King Declaration - WNT Rankings and Results, #40 Exhibit 19 to King Declaration - MNT Rankings and Results, #41 Exhibit 20 to King Declaration - WNT Surface and Flights, #42 Exhibit 21 to King Declaration - MNT Surface and Flights, #43 Declaration Carlyn Irwn Declaration, #44 Exhibit 1 to Irwin Declaration - Expert Report, #45 Declaration Changelle Egan Declaration, #46 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charges, #47 Declaration Praptika Raina Declaration, #48 Exhibit Lloyd Transcript Excerpts, #49 Exhibit Lloyd Exhibit 15 - 8-31-15 Lloyd Email to JWeil, #50 Exhibit Rapinoe Transcript Excerpts, #51 Exhibit Rapinoe Exhibit 29 - Transcript of Video, #52 Exhibit Rapinoe Exhibit 32 - Caitlin Murray Tweet, #53 Exhibit Klingenberg Transcript Excerpts, #54 Exhibit Klingenberg Exhibit 7 - American Voices Article, #55 Exhibit Langel 2016 Transcript Excerpts, #56 Exhibit Roux Transcript Excerpts, #57 Exhibit Roux Exhibit 5 - Constitution and Bylaws, #58 Exhibit Roux Exhibit 18 - 10-8-19 Roux Declaration, #59 Exhibit Roux Exhibit 37 - 3-29-17 Proposed WNT CBA Financial Terms, #60 Exhibit Nichols Transcript Excerpts, #61 Exhibit Nichols Exhibit 4 - 7-15-16 Judgment and 6-3-16 Opinion and Order, #62 Exhibit Nichols Exhibit 17 - 12-24-15 Nichols Emaiul to Levine, #63 Exhibit Nichols Exhibit 19 - 1-4-16 Nichols Email to Levine, #64 Exhibit Nichols Exhibit 31 - 6-20-16 - Nichols Email to Levine, #65 Exhibit Nichols Exhibit 33 - 7-22-16 Nichols Email to Levine, #66 Exhibit Langel Transcript Excerpts, #67 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 1 - Langel Bio, #68 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 4 - 11-1-12 Langel Memo, #69 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 6 - 11-24-14 Langel Email to Gulati, Flynn and Levine, #70 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 14 - 12-6-12 - Langel Email to Gulati and Levine, #71 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 15 - 12-10-12 Levine Letter to Langel, #72 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 19 - 2-20-13 Levine Email to Langel and Uselton, #73 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 20 - 2-19-13 Levine Letter to Lange, #74 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 21 - 2-28-13 - Langel MEmo to Levine, #75 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 23 - 3-5-13 Levine Email to Langel and Gulati, #76 Exhibit Langel Exhibit 25 - 3-8-13 Gulati Email to Langel, #77 Exhibit Supplemental Interrogatory Responses, #78 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Stolzenbach, Brian)
February 20, 2020 Filing 170 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendants liability under the Equal Pay Act, for compensation-based discrimination under Title VII, and Defendants First, Fourth, Sixth, Seventh, and Eighth affirmative defenses filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #3 Exhibit 1 - Tom King Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2 - 2013-2016 Memorandum of Understanding, #5 Exhibit 3 - 2005-2012 Collective Bargaining Agreement, #6 Exhibit 4 - 2017-2021 Collective Bargaining Agreement, #7 Exhibit 5 - 2011-2018 Collective Bargaining Agreement, #8 Exhibit 6 - John Langel Depostion Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 7 - 2004 John Langel Letter, #10 Exhibit 8 - Redacted Document, #11 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from CBA Meeting Notes, #12 Exhibit 10 - Sunil Gulati 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 11 - Redacted Document, #14 Exhibit 12 - Redacted Document, #15 Exhibit 13 - ESPN Article, #16 Exhibit 14 - Praptika Raina Deposition Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 15 - WNT Match Spreadsheet, #18 Exhibit 16 - Jill Ellis Deposition Excerpts, #19 Exhibit 17 - Alex Morgan Excerpts, #20 Exhibit 18 - Carli Lloyd Deposition Excerpts, #21 Exhibit 19 - Sunil Gulati Deposition Excerpts, #22 Exhibit 20 - Redacted Document, #23 Exhibit 21 - MNT Match Spreadsheet, #24 Exhibit 22 - USSF's 1.31.2020 Supplemental Responses, #25 Exhibit 23 - USSF Organization Chart, #26 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from 2020 AGM Book of Reports, #27 Exhibit 25 - USSF 5.31.2016 Letter to EEOC, #28 Exhibit 26 - Redacted Document, #29 Exhibit 27 - Redacted Document, #30 Exhibit 28 - Redacted Document, #31 Exhibit 29 - Megan Rapinoe Deposition Excerpts, #32 Exhibit 30 - Rich Nichols Deposition Excerpts, #33 Exhibit 31 - Redacted Document, #34 Exhibit 32 - Net Revenue Chart, #35 Exhibit 33 - Sunil Gulati Deposition Excerpts, #36 Request for Judicial Notice, #37 Exhibit 1 - USSF Website re WNT, #38 Exhibit 2 - Congress Webpage, #39 Exhibit 3 - MNT PA Statement, #40 Exhibit 4 - EEOC Webpage, #41 Exhibit 5 - USSF Safe Soccer Framework, #42 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2020 Filing 169 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 8, 11, 12, 20, 26, 27, 28 and 31 to the Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #168 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 8), #2 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 11), #3 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 12), #4 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 20), #5 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 26), #6 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 27), #7 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 28), #8 Unredacted Document (Exhibit 31))(Kessler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2020 Filing 168 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 8, 11, 12, 20, 26, 27, 28 and 31 to the Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document (Exhibit 8), #3 Redacted Document (Exhibit 11), #4 Redacted Document (Exhibit 12), #5 Redacted Document (Exhibit 20), #6 Redacted Document (Exhibit 26), #7 Redacted Document (Exhibit 27), #8 Redacted Document (Exhibit 28), #9 Redacted Document (Exhibit 31))(Kessler, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Defendant's Expert Testimony filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, #2 Exhibit 1 - Philip A. Miscimarra Expert Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Carlyn Irwin Expert Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Dr. Justin McCrary Expert Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Carlos Cordeiro Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5 - ESPN Article, #7 Exhibit 6 - Dr. Finnie B. Cook Expert Report, #8 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Expand page Limits for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions #165 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
February 12, 2020 Filing 165 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leiden, Diana)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Set the Depositions of Visa U.S.A., Inc., and Meghan Klingenberg After the Close of Discovery #160 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jp)
February 6, 2020 Filing 163 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE settling #162 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The court is satisfied, based on Plaintiffs' counsel's responses to the court's inquiries, that the issue about Document Request No. 25 is moot and that Plaintiffs' positions with respect to Document Request Nos. 1, 2, 5, 10 and 13 are clear. The court declined to order any supplemental written responses. Defendant raised an issue about two plaintiffs' written responses to an interrogatory about the identity of players who voted to ratify a specific collective bargaining agreement. The Court finds that the matter is untimely. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 02/06/2020. (hr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 162 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 161 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the request of Defendant, the Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for Thursday, February 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. PST. The court will conduct a telephonic discovery conference only as to those items about which counsel have conferred in good faith. Counsel should be prepared to address whether any requested relief (1) was or was not disclosed in time to allow for meaningful "meet and confer" among counsel, or (2) can or cannot practicably be accomplished by the close of discovery even if granted. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 3, 2020 Filing 160 STIPULATION for Order to Set the Depositions of Visa U.S.A. Inc. and Meghan Klingenberg After the Close of Discovery filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leiden, Diana)
January 31, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE (Fourteenth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
January 31, 2020 Filing 158 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE settling #157 Joint Report re: Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Court and counsel conferred as stated on the record. See Order, Dkt. No. 60 at 2. Court Recorder: CS 01/31/2020. (hr)
January 31, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Order for Joint Report re: Discovery Dispute filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Smentek, Sharilee)
January 30, 2020 Filing 156 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the request of Defendant, the Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for Friday, January 31, 2020, at noon PST. A joint agenda that lists the discovery issues must be filed on or before 10:00 a.m. PST on Friday, January 31, 2020. No argument should be included in the joint agenda. When filing the joint agenda, counsel are directed to use the "Discovery Motions - Order re Discovery Matter" event. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE (Thirteenth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
January 28, 2020 Filing 154 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: ORDER Re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Electronic and Text Notifications and Setting March 30, 2020 as Opt-in Deadline for FLSA Conditional Class #151 . the Comt GRANTS in part Plaintiffs ' Application. Plaintiffs may notify thefollowing potential opt-in plaintiffs of their EPA claims via an email transmitting the Notice of Pendency of an Equal Pay Act Lawsuit and Opt-In Consent Fo1m: 1. Taylor Smith;2. Heather O'Reilly; 3. Ashley Hatch; 4. Lynn Williams; 5. Lauren Baines;6. Haley Hanson; 7. Jaelen Hinkle; 8. Sydney Leroux;9. Briana Pinto; 10. Hope Solo; 11. Abby Wambach. These potential opt-in plaintiffs shall have 30 days from the date the email is trnnsmitted to opt-in to the FLSA collective action. (lc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE (Twelfth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
January 24, 2020 Filing 152 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Electronic and Text Notifications and Setting March 30, 2020 as Opt-In Deadline for FLSA Conditional Class #151 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Finkel, Noah)
January 23, 2020 Filing 151 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Authorizing Electronic and Text Notifications and Setting March 30, 2020 as Opt-In Deadline for FLSA Conditional Class filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden, #2 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
January 22, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE (Eleventh) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
January 21, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE (Tenth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
January 18, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/10/2020 re Transcript #148 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2020 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/10/2020. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS Certified Transcription, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2020. (ha)
January 17, 2020 Filing 146 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re: Status Report #144 . Plaintiffs' request that Defendant produce a Rule 30(b)(6) designee(s) on the following topic is GRANTED. The topic is the following: (see document for details). The court DENIED Plaintiffs' request for an order requiring Defendant to produce documents responsive to RFP No. 57. The remaining RFP Nos. in the Status Report filed on January 14, 2020 appear to be moot in light of Defendants recent document productions and/or representations on the record. Court Recorder: XTR 01/17/2020. (hr)
January 17, 2020 Filing 145 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the Court's own motion the telephonic discovery conference previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m. (Dkt. 143) is RESCHEDULED to 10:15 a.m. PST on Friday, January 17, 2020. The call-in information will remain the same. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 17, 2020 Filing 144 STATUS REPORT Regarding Further Telephonic Discovery Conference, filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
January 16, 2020 Filing 143 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order (Dkt. #142 ), a telephonic discovery conference is set for 10:00 a.m. PST on Friday, January 17, 2020. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2020 Filing 142 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case is called. Counsel state their appearances. The telephonic discovery conference is continued to Friday, January 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. PST. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Recorder: XTR 01/16/2020. (kl)
January 14, 2020 Filing 141 STATUS REPORT Regarding Minutes of Telephonic Discovery Conference (Doc. No. 137) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Leiden, Diana)
January 14, 2020 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Dina Metz at dmetz@winston.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Leiden, Diana)
January 13, 2020 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Laura Thixton at lthixton@seyfarth.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Peters, Kristen)
January 10, 2020 Filing 138 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order (Dkt. #137 ), a telephonic discovery conference is set for 1:00 p.m. PST on Thursday, January 16, 2020. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2020 Filing 137 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE re: #134 Joint Report held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that: 1. On or before January 14, 2020 by noon, Plaintiff shall identify the Requests for Production of Documents that are the subject of Issue No. 1 in the Joint Report. 2. The court sets a further telephonic discovery conference to address Issue No. 1 on Thursday, January 16, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. PST. 3. On or before January 17, 2020, Defendants shall produce the annual national team budgets and related documents identified during the conference. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 01/10/2020. (hr)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION for Order for Joint Report re: Discovery Dispute #134 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The hearing date has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (kl)
January 10, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Order for Joint Report re: Discovery Dispute #134 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (kl)
January 9, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Joint Report re: Discovery Dispute filed by Plaintiffs Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
January 7, 2020 Filing 133 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the request of Plaintiffs, the Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for Friday, January 10, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. A joint agenda that lists the discovery issues must be filed on or before noon on Thursday, January 9, 2020. No argument should be included in the joint agenda. When filing the joint agenda, counsel are directed to use the "Discovery Motions - Order re Discovery Matter" event. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE (Ninth) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
December 30, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE (Eighth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
December 17, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE (Seventh) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
December 16, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE (Sixth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
December 13, 2019 Filing 128 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant shall run the search terms in Attachment A to this order in the existing database of documents Defendant has already compiled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall confer on or before December 17, 2019 regarding an estimated time for commencement of a rolling production of responsive, nonprivileged documents and for completion of the rolling production. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 12/11/2019. (hr)
December 11, 2019 Filing 127 STATUS REPORT Regarding ESI Search Terms filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails Exchanged With Plaintiffs' Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Proposed Compromise)(Luce, Cheryl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 126 STATUS REPORT Regarding Minutes of Telephonic Discovery Conference (Doc. No. 124) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 9, 2019 Filing 125 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order (Dkt. #124 ), a telephonic discovery conference has been set for 2:00 p.m. PST on Wednesday, December 11, 2019. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 9, 2019 Filing 124 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that a further discovery conference is set on Wednesday, December 11, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' proposed search terms by tomorrow December 10, 2019. Defense counsel shall be prepared to address the timing of production of documents responsive to pay* w/5 equal* at the hearing on December 11, 2019. (See Order for Further Details) Court Recorder: XTR 12/09/2019. (kl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 122 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerbonito Status Report, #118 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND TITLE VIICLASS PERIOD #115 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby amends the Rule 23(b) (3) class definition set forth in its Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Doc. No. #98 ) to: "All WNT players whowere members of the WNT at any time from June 11, 2015 through the date of classcertification." (et)
December 6, 2019 Filing 121 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lev Tsukerman counsel for Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Adding Lev Tsukerman as counsel of record for Plaintiffs' for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Lev Tsukerman. (Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Morgan Brian(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Jane Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Danielle Colaprico(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Abby Dahlkemper(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Tierna Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Crystal Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Julie Ertz (pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Adrianna Franch(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Ashlyn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Tobin Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Lindsey Horan(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Rose Lavelle(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Carli Lloyd(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Allie Long (pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Merritt Mathias(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Jessica McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Samantha Mewis(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Alex Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Alyssa Naeher(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Kelley OHara(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Christen Press(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Mallory Pugh(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Megan Rapinoe(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Becky Sauerbrunn(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Casey Short(pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Emily Sonnett (pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party Andi Sullivan (pty:pla), Attorney Lev Tsukerman added to party McCall Zerboni(pty:pla))(Tsukerman, Lev)
December 6, 2019 Filing 120 Text Only Entry: Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for plaintiff shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry 115 (to the Judge's generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 6, 2019 Filing 119 PLAINTIFFS' REPORT of DISCOVERY DISPUTE [Dkt. 117] filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
December 6, 2019 Filing 118 STATUS REPORT Regarding ESI Search Terms filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alphabetical Listing of Term Hits (6/11/15 to Present), #2 Exhibit B - Numerical Listing of Term Hits (6/11/15 to Present), #3 Exhibit C - Alphabetical Listing of Term Hits (1/1/12 to Present), #4 Exhibit D - Numerical Listing of Term Hits (1/1/12 to Present))(Luce, Cheryl)
December 5, 2019 Filing 117 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order (Dkt. #116 ), a telephonic discovery conference has been set for 11:00 a.m. PST on Monday, December 9, 2019. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 5, 2019 Filing 116 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. A telephonic discovery conference is set on Monday, December 9, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. 2. By Friday, December 6, 2019, no later than noon, Plaintiffs shall file a Status Report that describes the particular Document Request Numbers at issue. 3. By Friday, December 6, 2019, Defendants shall file, under seal if appropriate, a Status Report that contains the search terms proposed by Plaintiffs and the data regarding hits for each search terms (directly and including families). (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 12/05/2019. (hr)
December 4, 2019 Filing 115 STIPULATION to Amend Title VII Class Period Order on Motion to Certify Class Action, #98 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #64 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spangler, Cardelle)
December 2, 2019 Filing 114 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Per Judge Rosenberg's Order (Dkt. #113 ), a telephonic discovery conference has been set for 11:00 a.m. PST on Thursday, December 5, 2019. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 2, 2019 Filing 113 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE settling #111 Joint Report Re: Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Plaintiffs agreed to serve their proposed search terms today. Defendant agreed to evaluate Plaintiffs' proposed search terms. The court set a further hearing to address the results on Thursday, December 5, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel are ordered to contact the courtroom deputy clerk, Mr. Lozada, if the hearing can be advanced to an earlier date and time. Court Recorder: XTR 12/02/2019. (hr)
December 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER on Stipulation #109 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby APPROVES the Title VII Class Action Notice (Exhibit 1 to the Joint Stipulation) and the Notice of Pendency of an FLSA Lawsuit (Exhibit 2 to theJoint Stipulation). (et)
November 29, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Order for Discovery Matter filed by Plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
November 27, 2019 Filing 110 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the request of Plaintiffs, the Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for Monday, December 2, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. PST. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 22, 2019 Filing 109 STIPULATION for Order Re: Proposed Class Notices filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Leiden, Diana)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Granting #104 Non-Resident Attorney Kyllan B. Kershaw APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Kristen M. Peters as local counsel. (et)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting #102 Non-Resident Attorney Sharilee K. Smentek APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Kristen M. Peters as local counsel. (et)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER CORRECTING AND REPLACING MINUTE ORDER #96 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. For the reasons stated on the record, the court ruled as follows: Issue No. 2: Defendant shall complete production of the following documents, including ESI, in its possession, custody, or control by November 8, 2019, so the parties may prepare for John Langel's deposition on November 21, 2019: (1) proposals and correspondence exchanged between the United States Women's National Team Players Association (WNTPA) and U.S. Soccer in connection with their negotiations for the 2013-2016 collective bargaining agreement between those parties (see document for further details) (hr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 105 STIPULATION to Correct Telephone Conference,,, #96 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re correction to minute order)(Egan, Chantelle)
November 15, 2019 Filing 104 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyllan B. Kershaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/14/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24781988) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Denying #100 Non-Resident Attorney Kyllan B. Kershaw APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. Terming Attorney Kyllan B Kershaw. (et)
November 15, 2019 Filing 102 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sharilee K. Smentek to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24792161) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
November 14, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyllan B. Kershaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24781988) #100 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
November 14, 2019 Filing 100 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kyllan B. Kershaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24781988) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery Deadlines and Non-Discoverability of Certain Expert Materials and Communications #97 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (DE #64 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Parties must meet and confer regarding the class notice and collective notice and submit final agreed upon notices to the court within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date of this Order. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
November 1, 2019 Filing 97 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Expert Deadlines and Non-Discoverability of Certain Expert Materials and Communications filed by Plaintiff Alex Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leiden, Diana)
October 30, 2019 Filing 96 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: Case is called. Counsel. For the reasons stated on the record, the court ruled as follows: Issue No. 2: Defendants shall complete production of documents, including ESI, for Mr. Langel by 11/8/2019. Defendants shall complete production of ESI for Mr. Burhalter, Mr. Cordero and Mr. Gulati by 11/12/2019 with the exception of their respective phones. Defendants shall complete production of non-ESI documents by 11/12/2019. Defendants shall complete the remainder of their rolling production by 11/22/2019. The court granted Plaintiffs request to complete production of the text messages by 11/22/2019. Court Recorder: XTR 10/30/2019. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
October 30, 2019 Filing 95 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the Court's own motion, the telephonic status conference previously set for for Wednesday, October 30, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. PDT #91 is RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, October 30, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. PDT. The call-in information will remian the same. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2019 Filing 94 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Soccer-Related Income From Sources Other Than U.S. Soccer #93 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, Interested Party Richard M. Nichols. (Attorney Jeffrey L Kessler added to party Richard M. Nichols(pty:ip))(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Soccer-Related Income From Sources Other Than U.S. Soccer filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Egan, Chantelle)
October 25, 2019 Filing 92 SCHEDULING NOTICE Per Judge Rosenberg's Order #91 , a telephonic status conference is set for for Wednesday, October 30, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. PDT. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 23, 2019 Filing 91 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE settling #87 Joint Report held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' request for a further order on production of text messages, whatsapp messages, etc. from the remaining 21 plaintiffs is DENIED AS PREMATURE. 2. A telephonic status conference is set on October 30, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. 3. Plaintiffs' request for an order requiring Defendant to add eight custodians (Kay Bradley, John Collins, Aaron Heifetz, Pinky Raina, Tonya Wallach, Neil Buethe, Steve Hoffman, and Michael Gressle) for Defendant's production of electronically stored information ("ESI") is GRANTED IN PART as follows: (see document for further details). Court Recorder: XTR 10/23/2019. (hr)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Ex Parle Application for Leave to file Sur-Reply(DE #86 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court hereby DENIES Defendant's Ex Parte Application. (SEE CIVIL MINUTE FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
October 23, 2019 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni for Court Reporter. Court will contact Dina Metz at dmetz@winston.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Leiden, Diana)
October 22, 2019 Filing 88 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #86 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Hughes Leiden)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Joint Report Re: Discovery Dispute filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 10/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Parsigian, Jeanifer)
October 21, 2019 Filing 86 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cheryl A. Luce, #2 Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, Ellen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 85 SCHEDULING NOTICE Per Judge Rosenberg's Order #69 , a telephonic discovery conference is set for for Wednesday, October 23, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. A joint agenda that lists the discovery issues must be filed on or before noon on Tuesday, October 22, 2019. No argument should be included in the joint agenda. When filing the joint agenda, counsel are directed to use the "Discovery Motions - Order re Discovery Matter" event. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2019 Filing 84 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case is called. Counsel state their appearances. The court conducted a telephonic discovery conference at the request of the parties regarding Topic No. 1 in Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Defendant United States Soccer Federation (USSF). The court and counsel conferred as stated on the record. (See Order for Further Details). Settling Motion #83 . Court Recorder: XTR 10/16/2019. (kl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (kl)
October 16, 2019 Filing 82 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that third party Mr. Nichols' motion to quash subpoena and for protection #71 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. (See Order for Further Details) Court Recorder: XTR 10/16/2019. (kl)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #64 , calendared for hearing on October 21, 2019, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 10, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Giovanna A Ferrari on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Attorney Giovanna A Ferrari added to party United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (pty:dft))(Ferrari, Giovanna)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg re Stipulation for Protective Order #76 . (see document for details) (hr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 78 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the request of Defendant, the Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for Wednesday, October 16, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #65 Non-Resident Attorney noah A Finkel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Kristen M Peters as local counsel. (jp)
October 9, 2019 Filing 76 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Egan, Chantelle)
October 8, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #64 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Morgan, #2 Declaration of Carli Lloyd, #3 Declaration of Becca Roux)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER TO STRIKEELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Reply in support of Motion to Certifiy Class #70 , for the following reasons: Single spaced text LR 11-3.6 Reply may be refiled by 12:00 noon on 10/09/2019. (jp)
October 8, 2019 Filing 73 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, re: MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTION #71 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant shall file an opposition on or before October 22, 2019. 2. Non-Party Nichols may file a reply on or before October 29, 2019. 3. The hearing date is continued to Tuesday, November 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom "550" in the Roybal Courthouse. 4. The subpoena to Mr. Nichols is stayed pending a ruling on the motion to quash. (hr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE (Fifth) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form)(Leiden, Diana)
October 7, 2019 Filing 70 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 10/08/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #74 ] -REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #64 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF REBECCA ROUX, #2 DECLARATION OF ALEX MORGAN, #3 DECLARATION OF CARLI LLOYD) (Kessler, Jeffrey). Modified on 10/8/2019 (jp).
October 4, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR PROTECTION filed by Non-Party Richard M. Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits) (hr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 69 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE & ORDER RE MOTION FOR DISCOVERY ORDER settling #68 Joint Report Re: Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall (1) collect the text messages from the 28 individual plaintiffs as stated on the record and (2) produce nonprivileged responsive text messages for seven individual plaintiffs as follows: the six individual plaintiffs who participated in the collective bargaining process plus one non-duplicative individual plaintiff who is a class representative in another litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic discovery conference is scheduled for October 23, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 10/04/2019. (hr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Joint Report Re: Discovery Dispute filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Leiden, Diana)
September 30, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #64 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen McLaughlin, #2 Declaration of Pinky Raina, #3 Declaration of Jay Berhalter, #4 Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Ellen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 66 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. At the request of Plaintiffs, the Court sets a telephonic discovery conference for Friday, October 4, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. A joint agenda that lists the discovery issues must be filed on or before noon on Thursday, October 3, 2019. No argument should be included in the joint agenda. When filing the joint agenda, counsel are directed to use the "Discovery Motions - Order re Discovery Matter" event. Counsel are to contact Judge Rosenberg's Courtroom Deputy, Karl Lozada, at agr_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 27, 2019 Filing 65 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Noah A. Finkel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24515720) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey Kessler, #2 Exhibit 1 (Kessler Bio) to Kessler Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 (Spangler Bio) to Kessler Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 (Feher Bio) to Kessler Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 (Notice of Collective Action) to Kessler Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 (Consent to Join Form) to Kessler Decl., #7 Declaration Cardelle Spangler, #8 Exhibit 1 (2013-2016 USWNT CBA) to Spangler Decl., #9 Exhibit 2 (2017-2021 USWNT CBA Excerpts) to Spangler Decl., #10 Exhibit 3 (2011-20118 USMNT CBA Excerpts) to Spangler Decl., #11 Exhibit 4 (MDL No. 2890 dckt 15; USSF Resp to MFT) to Spangler Decl., #12 Exhibit 5 (MDL No. 2890 dckt 1-1; Corrected Decl. Berhalter) to Spangler Decl., #13 Exhibit 6 (MDL No. 2890 dckt 15-1; Decl. King) to Spangler Decl., #14 Exhibit 7 (Comparison of Field Surfaces for WNT and MNT between January 2014 and June 2016) to Spangler Decl., #15 Declaration Mark Levinstein, #16 Declaration Jessica McDonald, #17 Declaration Christen Press, #18 Declaration Carli Lloyd, #19 Exhibit A (2019.02.05 Lloyd Notice of Right to Sue) to Lloyd Decl., #20 Declaration Becky Sauerbrunn, #21 Exhibit A (2019.02.05 Sauerbrunn Notice of Right to Sue) to Sauerbrunn Decl., #22 Declaration Alex Morgan, #23 Exhibit A (2019.02.05 Morgan Notice of Right to Sue) to Morgan Decl., #24 Declaration Megan Rapinoe, #25 Exhibit A (2019.02.05 Rapinoe Notice of Right to Sue) to Rapinoe Decl., #26 Proposed Order) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #62 Non-Resident Attorney Brian Stolzenbach APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of United States Soccer Federation, Inc, designating Kristen M Peters as local counsel. (lom)
August 28, 2019 Filing 62 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian Stolzenbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24344155) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Peters, Kristen)
August 28, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chantelle C Egan on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Attorney Chantelle C Egan added to party United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (pty:dft))(Egan, Chantelle)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM. (cch)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 6, 2020. (cch)
August 19, 2019 Filing 58 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Discovery cut-off 2/6/2020. Motions due by 2/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (cch)
August 9, 2019 Filing 57 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial two to four weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni.. (Leiden, Diana)
July 1, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (DE 46) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The court DENIES Defendant's Motion (DE 46 ). (jp)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 46 , calendared for hearing on July 1, 2019, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 46 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (McLaughlin, Ellen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cheryl A Luce counsel for Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Kara L. Goodwin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Luce, Cheryl)
June 12, 2019 Filing 52 Notice of Electronic Filing re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,, 50 e-mailed to Kara Goodwin, KGoodwin@seyfarth.com bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL NO. 2890, that the motion for centralization of these actions is denied. (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 50 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 46 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, # 5 Proposed Order)(Kessler, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Continue Hearing 48 . The motion will be taken under submission and there no appearances by counsel will be necessary. (jp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 48 STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Transfer Venue from July 1, 2019 to July 15, 2019 filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey L. Kessler, # 2 Declaration of Ellen E. McLaughlin, # 3 Proposed Order)(Leiden, Diana)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California 46 , noticed for hearing on 07/15/2019 at 9:00 am, HAS BEEN ADVANCED TO 07/01/2019 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 23, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to the First-To-File Rule, # 2 Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, Ellen)
May 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for August 19, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2019. (sw)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 43 Non-Resident Attorney Kara L Goodwin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Kristen M Peters as local counsel. (jp)
May 8, 2019 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kara L. Goodwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23703357) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(McLaughlin, Ellen)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT 40 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.s deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' First AmendedComplaint is extended to MAY 6, 2019. (lom)
May 1, 2019 Filing 40 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 filed by defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen M. Peters, # 2 Proposed Order)(Peters, Kristen)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS'COMPLAINT TO 14 DAYS AFTER THE JPML RULES ON THE PENDING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTIONS 36 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (lom)
April 30, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Motion to Stay Case (DE 26 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Accordingly, the Court DENIES without prejudice Defendant's motion (DE 26 ). (lom)
April 30, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Morgan Brian(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Jane Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Danielle Colaprico(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Abby Dahlkemper(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Tierna Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Crystal Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Julie Ertz (pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Adrianna Franch(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Ashlyn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Tobin Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Lindsey Horan(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Rose Lavelle(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Carli Lloyd(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Allie Long (pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Merritt Mathias(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Jessica McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Samantha Mewis(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Alex Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Alyssa Naeher(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Kelley OHara(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Christen Press(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Mallory Pugh(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Megan Rapinoe(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Becky Sauerbrunn(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Casey Short(pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Emily Sonnett (pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party Andi Sullivan (pty:pla), Attorney Jeanifer E Parsigian added to party McCall Zerboni(pty:pla))(Parsigian, Jeanifer)
April 29, 2019 Filing 36 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/13/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 filed by defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen M. Peters, # 2 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant United States Soccer Federation Inc.'s Motion to Stay Case Pending Panel Decision on Multidistrict Litigation 26 , calendared for hearing on April 29, 2019, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 32 Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl A Luce APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Kristen M Peters as local counsel. (jp)
April 5, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE (Fourth) filed by Plaintiff Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl A. Luce to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/27/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23451756) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl A. Luce to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23451756) 23 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 4/5/2019. (jp)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting 24 Non-Resident Attorney Ellen E McLaughlin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., designating Kristen M Peters as local counsel. (jp)
March 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl A. Luce to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23451756) 23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Peters, Kristen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc., identifying None. (Peters, Kristen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Panel Decision on Multidistrict Litigation (Unopposed) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Soccer Federation, Inc. answer now due 5/2/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc..(Peters, Kristen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ellen E. McLaughlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23452014) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Peters, Kristen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 23 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 3/29/2019, SE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 31] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl A. Luce to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23451756) filed by Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kristen M Peters added to party United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (pty:dft)) (Peters, Kristen) Modified on 3/29/2019 (jp).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cardelle B. Spangler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoeand designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel 15 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (lc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Feher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerbon and to Appear Pro Hac Vice 8 by Judge R. Gary Klausner (lc)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni and designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel 7 by Judge R. Gary Klausner (lc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Julie Ertz, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, Emily Sonnett, Megan Rapinoe, Allie Long, Kelley OHara, Alex Morgan, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Rose Lavelle, Ashlyn Harris, Andi Sullivan, Casey Short, Jane Campbell, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Tierna Davidson, Adrianna Franch, Samantha Mewis, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Abby Dahlkemper, Carli Lloyd, Mallory Pugh, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Morgan Brian, upon Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Leiden, Diana)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 19-03. ORDER case transferred from Judge Manuel L. Real to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-01717 RGK(AGRx). Signed by Judge Manuel L. Real and Judge R. Gary Klausner. (rn)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant United States Soccer Federation, Inc. (gk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE (Third) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cardelle B. Spangler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23352397) filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Exhibit (non-trial),, 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 filed by plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Leiden, Diana)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cardelle B. Spangler. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request,, 4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE (Second) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for Transfer of Action with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David G. Feher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23340235) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23340129) filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (First ) of Filing of Consent to Join Forms filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, identifying Alex Morgan, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Carli Lloyd, Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni, and United States Soccer Federation, Inc.. (Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Exhibit (non-trial),, 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley OHara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan, McCall Zerboni. (Exhibit A to Complaint) as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, 1 . (Leiden, Diana)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23339973 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Julie Ertz, Alyssa Naeher, Danielle Colaprico, Emily Sonnett, Megan Rapinoe, Allie Long, Kelley OHara, Alex Morgan, Merritt Mathias, Christen Press, Rose Lavelle, Ashlyn Harris, Andi Sullivan, Casey Short, Jane Campbell, McCall Zerboni, Becky Sauerbrunn, Tierna Davidson, Adrianna Franch, Samantha Mewis, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Abby Dahlkemper, Carli Lloyd, Mallory Pugh, Crystal Dunn, Jessica McDonald, Morgan Brian. (Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Morgan Brian(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Jane Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Danielle Colaprico(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Abby Dahlkemper(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Tierna Davidson(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Crystal Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Julie Ertz (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Adrianna Franch(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Ashlyn Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Tobin Heath(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Lindsey Horan(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Rose Lavelle(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Carli Lloyd(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Allie Long (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Merritt Mathias(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Jessica McDonald(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Samantha Mewis(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Alex Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Alyssa Naeher(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Kelley OHara(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Christen Press(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Mallory Pugh(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Megan Rapinoe(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Becky Sauerbrunn(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Casey Short(pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Emily Sonnett (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party Andi Sullivan (pty:pla), Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party McCall Zerboni(pty:pla))(Leiden, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alex Morgan et al v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Rapinoe
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Sauerbrunn
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Lavelle
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Dunn
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Colaprico
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Short
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merritt Mathias
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley OHara
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McDonald
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCall Zerboni
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Pugh
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tierna Davidson
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carli Lloyd
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobin Heath
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Brian
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen Press
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Horan
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlyn Harris
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Dahlkemper
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Campbell
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sonnett
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Mewis
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Franch
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ertz
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andi Sullivan
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Morgan
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Naeher
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allie Long
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Brian D Netter
Represented By: Cardelle B Spangler
Represented By: Jeanifer E Parsigian
Represented By: Lev Tsukerman
Represented By: Nicole A Saharsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Soccer Federation, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie L Wine
Represented By: Brian M Stolzenbach
Represented By: Chantelle C Egan
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Ellen E McLaughlin
Represented By: Giovanna A. Ferrari
Represented By: Kara L Goodwin
Represented By: Kristen M Peters
Represented By: Kuan Huang
Represented By: Kyllan B Kershaw
Represented By: Michele D Johnson
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: Sarah M Gragert
Represented By: Sharilee K Smentek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Richard M. Nichols
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Stephen P Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?