Bernadette Moise v. Nelnet Academic Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bernadette Moise
Defendant: Nelnet Academic Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive, Trans Union LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02001
Filed: March 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court ORDERS the parties in the above-entitled action to file a joint status report on or before July 3, 2019. The status report shall not exceed five pages. The parties shall address the following: 1) Status of the case; 2) Whether the parties have attempted to settle the case. If the parties have not attempted to settle the case, why the parties have not yet attempted to do so. And, if the parties have attempted to settle, what the issue was and why the case did not settle. 3) Each sides' suggestion of procedures that would facilitate resolution of this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on OCTOBER 21, 2019 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before SEPTEMBER 30, 2019, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before OCTOBER 14, 2019. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as NOVEMBER 19, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch)
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Bernadette Moise pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) to dismiss with prejudice as to Nelnet Academic Services, LLC. (Friedman, Todd)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Moise.. (Friedman, Todd)
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Quinn, Thomas)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Nelnet Academic Services, LLC filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Moise. (Friedman, Todd)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Bernadette Moise pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Trans Union LLC. (Friedman, Todd)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on March 26, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pham, Bao)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nelnet Academic Services, LLC, identifying Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Sandler, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nelnet Academic Services, LLC answer now due 4/9/2019, filed by defendant Nelnet Academic Services, LLC.(Attorney Jonathan Charles Sandler added to party Nelnet Academic Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Sandler, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services LLC answer now due 4/19/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Pham, Bao)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-02001 R(ASx). (rn)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Alka Sagar. New Case Number 2:19-cv-02001 CAS (ASx). (esa)
March 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filed in state court 2/28/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
March 16, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITAL executed by Plaintiff Bernadette Moise, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY Of COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nelnet Academic Services, LLC, Trans Union LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Bernadette Moise. (Filed in state court 2/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1 (esa)
March 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian PLC; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Pham, Bao)
March 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Pham, Bao)
March 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STLC01441 Receipt No: 0973-23387196 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #2 Exhibit Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit Nelnet Academic Services, LLC's Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit Equifax Information Services LLC's Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit Trans Union LLC's Consent to Removal) (Attorney Bao A Pham added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pham, Bao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernadette Moise v. Nelnet Academic Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Academic Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Bao A Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Moise
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?