Marchand Elliott v. Ronald Davis
Petitioner: Marchand Elliott
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 2:2019cv02039
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT PURSUANT TO COURTS MARCH 20, 2019 ORDER filed by Petitioner Marchand Elliott Joint (Yamsuan, Andrea)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Laura Paul on behalf of Petitioner Marchand Elliott. Filed by Petitioner Marchand Elliott. (Attorney Laura Paul added to party Marchand Elliott(pty:pet))(Paul, Laura)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Emily J Groendyke on behalf of Petitioner Marchand Elliott. Filed by Petitioner Marchand Elliott. (Attorney Emily J Groendyke added to party Marchand Elliott(pty:pet))(Groendyke, Emily)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Andrea Arisa Yamsuan on behalf of Petitioner Marchand Elliott. Filed by Petitioner Marchand Elliott. (Attorney Andrea Arisa Yamsuan added to party Marchand Elliott(pty:pet))(Yamsuan, Andrea)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STAYING EXECUTION AND APPOINTING COUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #1 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the execution of Petitioner's sentence of death and all court and other proceedings related to the execution of that sentence, including preparation for execution and setting an execution date, are stayed. The stay shall be in effect for ninety days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender of the United States District Court for the Central District of California is appointed as counsel for petitioner Marchand Elliott in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within ninety days, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint statement with the Court. In that statement Petitioner will communicate whether he intends to include claims in his federal petition that have not been exhausted in the California state courts as required by the Antiterrorism and Effective Death Penalty Act of 1996, 28 U.S.C. 2254. Respondent shall state whether he intends to waive the complete exhaustion requirement. After the parties have submitted their joint statement, the Court will issue an initial case management order that will address the pleadings and the next stages of the litigation. (lom)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT and Commencement of Capital Habeas Corpus Case. This capital habeas case was initiated on 3/19/2019 and has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. (lh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST by Prisoner for Appointment of Counsel in California Death Sentence Case and For Stay of Execution of Death Sentence; Declaration of Marchand Elliott, filed by Petitioner Marchand Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchand Elliott v. Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marchand Elliott
Represented By: Laura Paul
Represented By: Emily J Groendyke
Represented By: Andrea Arisa Yamsuan
Represented By: Federal Public Defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?