Casey Riccardi v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: CASEY RICCARDI
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA and GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN FOR JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02053
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Ellis, Patricia)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN FOR JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. #15 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN FOR JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (the Plan) be dismissed from this action without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys fees and costs directly related to the instant Stipulation to Dismiss the Plan and the dismissal of the Plan. The Prudential Insurance Company of America shall remain the only named defendant in this action. (shb)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Group Long Term Disability Plan For JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Patricia)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN FOR JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. #13 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #13 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant W.W. GRAINGER, INC. GROUP BENEFIT PLAN I (erroneously sued as "W.W. GRAINGER, INC. GROUP BENEFIT PLAN 1") (the "Plan") be dismissed from this action without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs directly related to the instant Stipulation to Dismiss the Plan and the dismissal of the Plan. The Prudential Insurance Company of America shall remain the only named defendant in this action. (bm)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Group Long Term Disability Plan For JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellis, Patricia)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Linda Marie Lawson added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Lawson, Linda)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 5/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Patricia A Ellis added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ellis, Patricia)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Casey Riccardi, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte of CT Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Darras, Frank)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Group Long Term Disability Plan For JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (et)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (et)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff CASEY RICCARDI. (Darras, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff CASEY RICCARDI. (Darras, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CASEY RICCARDI, (Darras, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CASEY RICCARDI. (Darras, Frank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23404228 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CASEY RICCARDI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Frank N Darras added to party CASEY RICCARDI(pty:pla))(Darras, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey Riccardi v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Patricia A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUP LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN FOR JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY RICCARDI
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?