Immigrant Defenders Law Center et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al
Plaintiff: Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities and Public Counsel
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2019cv02058
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JULY 22, 2019 #18 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 22, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk, Office of the United States Attorney. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General of the United States. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra)
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing formal Title page with required LR 11-3.8 required party, attorney court, case information. Pdf is only set of Green postal return receipts.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on April 18, 2019 to Robert J. Liubicic for payment made on March 20, 2019 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #10 . (lmh)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Sam Hillhouse, Authorized Agent. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Angela Fiorentino-Rios. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Rocio Colon. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (esa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (esa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, (Liubicic, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23405523 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Immigrant Defenders Law Center(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Public Counsel(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic(pty:pla))(Liubicic, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immigrant Defenders Law Center et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic
Represented By: Alexandra Achamallah
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Paul S Aronzon
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Robert J Liubicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Defenders Law Center
Represented By: Alexandra Achamallah
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Paul S Aronzon
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Robert J Liubicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities
Represented By: Alexandra Achamallah
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Paul S Aronzon
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Robert J Liubicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Counsel
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Paul S Aronzon
Represented By: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Robert J Liubicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?