Sean Carter v. Michael Fiore et al
Plaintiff: Sean Carter
Defendant: Michael Fiore and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02176
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Adam I. Gafni In Response to OSC re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Sean Carter. (Gafni, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff(s) ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before July15, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order To Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiffs response. If plaintiff files A timely answer by the following defendant(s): Michael Fiore OR Plaintiffs application for entry of default as to defendant(s): Michael Fioreon or before the date indicated above, the court will consider this a satisfactory response to the OrderTo Show Cause. If a satisfactory response is not filed by the date listed above, the matter will be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (lc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sean Carter Sean Carter. Waiver of Service signed by Michael Fiore. (Gafni, Adam)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sean Carter, upon Defendant Michael Fiore served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Fiore in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Gafni, Adam)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect Event of Miscellaneous Document was selected in the e-filing of the Request for Clerk to Issue Summons. The clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect the true name of the docket item. The true event is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints - Summons Request. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael Fiore. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 [REQUEST FOR CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS filed as] SUMMONS re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Gafni, Adam) Modified on 3/25/2019 (car).
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Sean Carter. (Gafni, Adam)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23425883 - Fee: $400, filed by Sean Carter Sean Carter. (Attorney Adam I Gafni added to party Sean Carter(pty:bkmov))(Gafni, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean Carter v. Michael Fiore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Carter
Represented By: Adam I Gafni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?