Michael Slack v. Mike Malamut HR, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Slack
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Mike Malamut HR, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02193
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION OF PANEL MEDIATOR; ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2) #21 : IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: ADA Access Litigation. Filed by Plaintiff Michael Slack(Shahriari, Peter)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT of Case filed by Plaintiff Michael Slack re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22), #19 . (Shahriari, Peter)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: ninety (90) days from the date of this Order. (bm)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mike Malamut HR, LLC, (Karlin, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Mike Malamut HR, LLC.(Karlin, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Mike Malamut HR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Karlin, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mike Malamut HR, LLC answer now due 5/24/2019, filed by Defendant Mike Malamut HR, LLC.(Attorney Michael Joseph Karlin added to party Mike Malamut HR, LLC(pty:dft))(Karlin, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Slack, upon Defendant Mike Malamut HR, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Malamut - Co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shahriari, Peter)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (wm)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02193 PSG(ASx). (rn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mike Malamut HR, LLC. (ghap)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Michael Slack. (Shahriari, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Michael Slack, (Shahriari, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Slack. (Shahriari, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23428773 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Mike Malamut HR, LLC. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Mike Malamut HR, LLC(pty:dft))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Slack v. Mike Malamut HR, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Malamut HR, LLC
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Michael Joseph Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Slack
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?