Zurich American Insurance Company v. BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc.

Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: BNSF LOGISTICS OCEAN LINE, INC., and BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02256
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Southwick, Joshua)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc. answer now due 5/3/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc..(Attorney Kathleen Collins Jeffries added to party BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jeffries, Kathleen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company, upon Defendant BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc. served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System - Melissa Torres - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Subpoena Request (AO 88) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected to e-file docket item 2. The correct event is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. The clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect the true title of the document. (car)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc. (car)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Zurich American Insurance Company, identifying HILTI, INC.. (Southwick, Joshua)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 [REQUEST FOR CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS filed as] Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by PLAINTIFF Zurich American Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua) Modified on 3/27/2019 (car).
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23444024 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET) (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF LOGISTICS OCEAN LINE, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Logistics Ocean Line, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua A Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?