Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: STEWART LUCAS MURREY and Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey
Defendant: CODY HALCHISHAK, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, KERRY YOUNG, LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT, SCOTTY STEVENS, ROBYN SALAZAR, BRITTANY ROYER, DESHON ANDREWS, Bill Royer, C. Halchishak, Andrews, Stevens and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02501
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PRO SE CLINIC INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The Court advises Plaintiff of the existence of the Federal Pro Se Clinics, which offer on-site information and guidance to individuals who are representing themselves (proceeding pro se) in federal civil actions. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING IN CIVIL RIGHTS CASE held before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Fact discovery in this action must be completed by or before March 13, 2020. Initial Expert Disclosures must be produced no later than April 13, 2020; any rebuttal expert disclosures must be produced no later than April 27, 2020; and all expert discovery must be completed by or before April 29, 2020. (See Order for complete details) Court Recorder: XTR 06/13/19. (afe)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. On the Court's own motion, the previously scheduled Scheduling Conference 17 set for June 13, 2019 10:00 a.m. has been moved to June 13, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are to call-in utilizing the same call-in number and password that was previously e-mailed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. A Scheduling Conference via telephone conference is set for June 13, 2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The call-in number and password will be e-mailed to the parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The initial order granting pro se litigant, Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey, permission to electronically file has been REVOKED for failure to comply with the Court's order (see Docket Entry No. 14 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendants Andrews, City of Los Angeles, C. Halchishak, Bill Royer, Stevens, Kerry Young.. (McAleer, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant, plaintiff Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey, must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey. (hr)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Reference of Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon is vacated. Case transferred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for Report and Recommendation. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-02501 FMO (AS). (esa)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The previously set Scheduling Conference by Judge Olguin is hereby vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Andrews, City of Los Angeles, C. Halchishak, Bill Royer, Stevens, Kerry Young, re Text Only Scheduling Notice, 7 served on 04/10/19. (McAleer, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Andrews, City of Los Angeles, C. Halchishak, Bill Royer, Stevens, Kerry Young.(McAleer, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Andrews, City of Los Angeles, C. Halchishak, Bill Royer, Stevens, Kerry Young, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on 04/05/19. (McAleer, Matthew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
April 3, 2019 CONFORMED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/20/2019, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil)
April 3, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey in Los Angeles Superior Court 10/31/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DESHON ANDREWS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CODY HALCHISHAK, BRITTANY ROYER, ROBYN SALAZAR, SCOTTY STEVENS, KERRY YOUNG, (McAleer, Matthew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DESHON ANDREWS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CODY HALCHISHAK, BRITTANY ROYER, ROBYN SALAZAR, SCOTTY STEVENS, KERRY YOUNG. (McAleer, Matthew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18SMCV00141 Receipt No: 0973-23488442 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANTS BRITTANY ROYER, ROBYN SALAZAR, KERRY YOUNG, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, SCOTTY STEVENS, DESHON ANDREWS, CODY HALCHISHAK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit FAC, #4 Exhibit FAC Summons, #5 Exhibit Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, #8 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment, #9 Exhibit Order on Court Fee Waiver, #10 Exhibit Notice of Case Management, #11 Exhibit Notice of Change of Address, #12 Exhibit POS to City of Los Angeles, #13 Exhibit POS to Deshon Andrews, #14 Exhibit POS to Cody Halchishack, #15 Exhibit POS to Brittany Royer, #16 Exhibit POS to Robyn Salazar, #17 Exhibit POS to Scotty Stevens, #18 Exhibit POS to Kerry Young, #19 Exhibit Summons to City of Los Angeles, #20 Exhibit Summons to Deshon Andrews, #21 Exhibit Summons to Cody Halchishack, #22 Exhibit Summons to Brittany Royer, #23 Exhibit Summons to Robyn Salazar, #24 Exhibit Summons to Scotty Stevens, #25 Exhibit Summons to Kerry Young) (Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party DESHON ANDREWS(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party CITY OF LOS ANGELES(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party CODY HALCHISHAK(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party BRITTANY ROYER(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party ROBYN SALAZAR(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party SCOTTY STEVENS(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W McAleer added to party KERRY YOUNG(pty:dft))(McAleer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODY HALCHISHAK
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY YOUNG
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTY STEVENS
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBYN SALAZAR
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY ROYER
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESHON ANDREWS
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Royer
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Halchishak
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens
Represented By: Matthew W McAleer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEWART LUCAS MURREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Stewart Lucas Murrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?