United States of America v. Paul G. Schifino

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Paul G Schifino
Case Number: 2:2019cv02527
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES OF HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Following discussions with the parties, the Court advises counsel that the matter is taken under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (shb) Modified on 7/2/2019 (shb).
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY filed by Petitioner United States of America to Reply #7 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 United States' Reply in Support of its Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons; and Declaration in Support Thereof (Shariff, Najah)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: re: Stipulation to Continue the Order to Show Cause Hearing #8 . The Court having read and considered said stipulation, hereby continues the Order to Show cause to JUNE 25, 2019 AT 10:00 a.m. (shb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply #7 , Stipulation to Continue #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case number is 2:`9-cv-02527-CBM (PLAx). Please use the complete case number on all documents filed with the Court. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Continue order to show cause to on or after June 18, 2019 Re: Order,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #5 filed by Respondent Paul G Schifino.(Attorney Sanford I Millar added to party Paul G Schifino(pty:res))(Millar, Sanford)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY filed by Respondent Paul G Schifino to Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Millar, Sanford)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, served on 05/20/2019. (Shariff, Najah)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. IT IS ORDERED that Respondent Paul G. Schifino (Respondent) appears before this District Court of the United States for the Central District of California in Courtroom No. 8B, First Street Federal Courthouse, 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012 on JUNE 4, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. and show cause why the production of all the books, papers, records and other data demanded in the subject Internal Revenue Service summons should not be compelled. See order for further details. (shb)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Shariff, Najah)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration in Support Thereof No Fee Required - US Government, filed by petitioner United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Najah J Shariff added to party United States of America(pty:pet))(Shariff, Najah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Paul G. Schifino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Najah J Shariff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul G Schifino
Represented By: Sanford I Millar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?