In Re Paula Parisi
Appellant: Paula Parisi
Appellee: Selene Finance, ABS REO Trust VI, U.S. Bank National Association BCAT 2016-18TT and Select Portfolio Servicing
Case Number: 2:2019cv02606
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER DENYING APPELLANTS MOTION FOR REHEARING #37 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Appellant Paula Parisi (Appellant) brings this motion for rehearing under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8022(a)(1). Dkt. 37. For the reasons articulated below, this motion is DENIED. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
November 3, 2019 Filing 41 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. Re: Appellants Opening Brief #39 First amended - Appendix Vols. 1-3 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix)(Parisi, Paula)
October 29, 2019 Filing 40 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. Re: Appellants Opening Brief #39 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix)(Parisi, Paula)
October 14, 2019 Filing 39 APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. (Parisi, Paula)
October 11, 2019 Filing 38 Table of Authorities filed by Appellant Paula Parisi re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Order to Dismiss Appeal #37 (Parisi, Paula)
October 10, 2019 Filing 37 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Order to Dismiss Appeal filed by Appellant / Debtor Paula Parisi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Appellant Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Dkt 36 Dismissal, #3 Appendix BK Court Order, Ruling) (Parisi, Paula)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL OF BANKRUPTCY COURT DECISION REGARDING AUTOMATIC STAY AS MOOT GIVEN SALE OF PROPERTY AND INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF UNDERLYING BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Given Appellant's prior admission that permitting the foreclosure sale would render her appeal moot, her failure to file an initial brief citing any other form of relevant relief requested, and the fact that the Chapter 11 case in question has been involuntarily dismissed, this Court GRANTS Appellee's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to mootness #26 . See document for further details. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 35 Request to add U.S. Trustee to CM/ECF Notice filed by Appellant Paula Parisi (Parisi, Paula) Modified on 9/15/2019 (mrgo).
September 11, 2019 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Appellant / Debtor Paula Parisi, re Response in Opposition to Motion #33 served on 09/10/2019. (Parisi, Paula)
September 10, 2019 Filing 33 OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. (Parisi, Paula)
September 5, 2019 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - Hearing on Bankruptcy Appeal previously scheduled for 09/09/2019 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled to 9/30/2019 at 1:30 PM THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First REQUEST to Correct Bankr. Ct. Dkt. 40, with leave of District Court #28 , First REQUEST to Amend Bankr. Ct. Dkt. 40, with leave of District Court #29 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The document is stricken. Other: FRCP Rule 60 does not require the leave of the District Court to amend a Bankruptcy Court Docket. The District Court has only appellate jurisdiction over this proceeding, and clerical errors instead require seeking leave to amend from the Bankruptcy Court that controls the relevant docket.Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Rule 9024 only extends Rule 60's procedural requirements to bankruptcy, rather than granting District Courts the independent ability to amend the docket of a Bankruptcy proceeding. (lc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST to Correct Bankr. Ct. Dkt. 40, with leave of District Court #28 , First REQUEST to Amend Bankr. Ct. Dkt. 40, with leave of District Court #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request or Application to Amend. Other error(s) with document(s): The Notice of Clerical Error (Form G-11) is for court use only. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 22, 2019 Filing 29 First REQUEST to Amend Bankr. Ct. Dkt. 40, with leave of District Court filed by Appellant / Debtor Paula Parisi. (Attachments: #1 Signed Application Motion (Dkt. 109) entered Bankr. Ct. 08-21-19) (Parisi, Paula) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lc).(STRICKEN PER 9/4/19 COURT G112B RESPONSE)
August 22, 2019 Filing 28 First REQUEST to Correct Bankr. Ct. Dkt. 40, with leave of District Court filed by Appellant / Debtor Paula Parisi. (Parisi, Paula) Modified on 9/4/2019 (lc).(STRICKEN PER 9/4/19 COURT G112B RESPONSE)
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE filed by Appellees Selene Finance, U.S. Bank National Association BCAT 2016-18TT. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, September 30, 2019, 1:30 pm (Luu, Kelsey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and Proof of Service filed by Appellees Selene Finance, U.S. Bank National Association BCAT 2016-18TT. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit) (Luu, Kelsey)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF ON APPEAL #24 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time for filing the Appellant's opening brief in the above-entitled case be extended to: July 15, 2019. (es)
July 5, 2019 Filing 24 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief on Appeal, First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to file Bankruptcy Appeal petition to 7/15/2019 filed by appellant and debtor Paula Parisi. (Parisi, Paula)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EMERGENCY STAY PENDING APPEAL #22 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Having reviewed Appellant's ex parte application for an emergency stay pending appeal, Dkt. 22, the Court DENIES Appellant's application. (mrgo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Appeal filed by appellant and debtor U.S. Bank National Association BCAT 2016-18TT. (Parisi, Paula)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE, BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND NOTICE OF ENTRY (DKT. 20) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: (Appellants Opening Brief due by 7/5/2019. Appellee Brief due by 8/5/2019. Appellants Reply Brief due by 8/19/2019.) Hearing set for 9/9/19, at 1:30 p.m. (mrgo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 7/5/2019. (mrgo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 . (mrgo)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Designation of Record, Statement of Issues and Notice of Transcripts on Appeal filed by appellant and debtor Paula Parisi, Paula Parisi. (Parisi, Paula)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: APPELLANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME #16 - The Court grants the extension, to and including, 4/26/2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 APPELLANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DESIGNATION OF RECORD, STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL AND NOTICE REGARDING ORDERING OF TRANSCRIPTS re APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case #12 filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. (Parisi, Paula)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 IN CHAMBERS ORDER - TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiffs Application for Permission for Electronic Filing #12 is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff is to refer to the courts website, review Electronic Filing for Pro Se Litigants, Step 3: submit G-80 form as instructed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER DENYING AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #10 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Having reviewed Appellant's amended ex parte application for a temporary restraining order, Dkt. 10, the Court DENIES Appellant's application. (mrgo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by appellant Paula Parisi. (mrgo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Appellant in support of AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #10 filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. (mrgo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by appellant Paula Parisi. (mrgo)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Having reviewed Appellants ex parte motion for a temporary restraining order #7 , the Court DENIES Appellants motion.IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Appellant in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #7 filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. (mrgo)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by appellant Paula Parisi. (mrgo)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 CORRECTED NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Appellee U.S. Bank National Association BCAT 2016-18TT was erroneously entered as U.S. Bank National Association. A corrected ADR Form will be issued with the full name Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 (car)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 4/5/2019. (car)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER IMPOSING A STAY OR CONTINUING THE AUTOMATIC STAY entered on 3/21/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Victoria S. Kaufman, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 4/4/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:19-bk-10299-VK, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE., filed by Appellant Paula Parisi. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) Modified on 4/5/2019 (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Paula Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Paula Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Selene Finance
Represented By: James F Lewin
Represented By: Kelsey X Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABS REO Trust VI
Represented By: Kelly Marie Raftery
Represented By: Kelly Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association BCAT 2016-18TT
Represented By: James F Lewin
Represented By: Kelsey X Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing
Represented By: Kelly Marie Raftery
Represented By: Kelly Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?