Yakov Mizrahi v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yakov Mizrahi
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and Does 1-10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02623
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 07/15/2019 at 3:00 PM is vacated and off-calendar. Jury trial is set for 11/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 11/18/2019 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc Edward Dann counsel for Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi. Adding Marc E. Dann as counsel of record for Yakov Mizrahi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marc E. Dann. (Dann, Marc)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Marc E. Dann APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Yakov Mizarahi, designating John R Habashy as local counsel. (es)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi.(Buda, Tiffany)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc E. Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24021053) filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Habashy, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Order Setting Initial Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi. (Buda, Tiffany)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/15/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc., identifying Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Real Time Group, Inc. Real Time Group, Inc. is not publicly traded, and no publicly-held corporation owns 10% or more of its stock.. (Abolian, Dalar)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dalar Abolian on behalf of Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (Abolian, Dalar)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc..(Abolian, Dalar)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #14 . Defendant Real Time may file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint by June 6, 2019. (mrgo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 6, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abolian, Dalar)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Real Time Resolutions, Inc. answer now due 5/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc..(Attorney Dalar Abolian added to party Real Time Resolutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Abolian, Dalar)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi, upon Defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proof of Service)(Buda, Tiffany)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 Re New Case Order and Re Notice of Judicial Assignment served on 4/15/2019. (Buda, Tiffany)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Real Time Resolutions, Inc. (mrgo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi. (Buda, Tiffany)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi, (Habashy, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi. (Habashy, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Yakov Mizrahi. (Habashy, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23506514 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Yakov Mizrahi. (Attorney John R Habashy added to party Yakov Mizrahi(pty:pet))(Habashy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yakov Mizrahi v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yakov Mizrahi
Represented By: John R Habashy
Represented By: Marc Edward Dann
Represented By: Tiffany Noelle Buda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Abraham J Colman
Represented By: Tuan Van Uong
Represented By: Dalar Abolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?