Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA, LLC
Defendant: HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC., DOES 1-100, and Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2019cv02624
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Continuance of July 22, 2019 Scheduling Conference #10 in the above-referenced matter is continued to 7/29/2019 at 11:00 AM. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 22, 2019 to July 29, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #8 filed by Defendant HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Joint Stip to Continue Scheduling Conference, #2 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Scheduling Conference)(Hill, Courtney)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal filed by Defendant HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc.. (Joo, Sylvia)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #6 served on April 9, 2019. (Hill, Courtney)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
April 5, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
April 5, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC., identifying Plaintiff Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC; Medical Provider La Peer Surgery Center; and Defendant HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc., a wholly-owned subsidiary of HealthSCOPE Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of UMR, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of United HealthCare Services, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated, a publicly-traded holding company. (Attorney Sylvia Joo added to party HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC.(pty:dft))(Joo, Sylvia)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC.. (Joo, Sylvia)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19SMCV00414 Receipt No: 0973-23506577 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sylvia Joo ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Joo Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Joo Declaration, #4 Declaration of Brett Edwards ISO Removal) (Attorney Courtney C Hill added to party HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC.(pty:dft))(Hill, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Ally Management of California, LLC v. HealthSCOPE Benefits, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTHCARE ALLY MANAGEMENT OF CALIFORNIA, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Newborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHSCOPE BENEFITS, INC.
Represented By: Courtney C Hill
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?