Tyrone Murphy v. J. Sullivan

Petitioner: Tyrone Murphy
Respondent: J. Sullivan
Case Number: 2:2019cv02726
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Unsigned letter, unsigned and incomplete sate habeas petition submitted by Petitioner Tyrone Murphy received on 6/21/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Documents are unsigned, in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. Petitioner has been warned about this previously. He must comply with the Court's Order of June 17, 2019 [Docket 7]. (ec)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Order to Show Case re: Possible Dismissal. By no later than July 22, 2019, Petitioner shall take one of the following three actions depending on whether or not he concedes that the Petition is unexhausted. (See order for details) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal) (ec)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Letter submitted by Petitioner Tyrone Murphy received on 6/12/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Document is not signed, in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. The Court is reviewing Petitioner's habeas petition; this is not an appeal, contrary to Petitioner's assertions. (ec)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Letter submitted by Petitioner Tyrone Murphy received on 5/13/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Document is not signed, in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11. (ec)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: denying #4 Request for Appointment of Counsel. (ec)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Tyrone Murphy. (ec)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (car)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Tyrone Murphy. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyrone Murphy v. J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?