William Henry Jackson v. Dean Borders

Petitioner: William Henry Jackson
Respondent: Dean Borders
Case Number: 2:2019cv02728
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Extension of Time to File Opposition toMotion to Dismiss #10 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Petitioner may file his response to the motion to dismiss on or before August 1, 2019. (iva)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Petitioner William Henry Jackson. (sbou)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex_1, 2018 Superior Court Order, #2 Exhibit Ex_2, Inmate Board Action, #3 Exhibit Ex_3, 2008 Order Denying Petition)(Cano, Jennifer)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by RESPONDENT Dean Borders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order) (Cano, Jennifer)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting #6 APPLICATION for Extension of Time. Respondent is granted until June 14, 2019 to file a Motion to Dismiss and until July 1, 2019 to file an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Dismiss or an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RESPONDENT Dean Borders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS EX PARTE REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME) (Cano, Jennifer)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Ora Cano counsel for Respondent Dean Borders. Adding Jennifer O. Cano as counsel of record for Dean Borders for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by RESPONDENT Dean Border. (Attorney Jennifer Ora Cano added to party Dean Borders(pty:res))(Cano, Jennifer)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Consent) (kca)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before a United States Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner William Henry Jackson. (car)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #1 CV111) (esa).
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner William Henry Jackson. (car) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/15/2019) (dd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Henry Jackson v. Dean Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Borders
Represented By: Jennifer Ora Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Henry Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?