Jitrade, Inc. v. A'Gaci, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Jitrade, Inc.
Defendant: A'Gaci, L.L.C., Does 1-10, J & Dong Fashion, Inc., J and Dong Fashion, Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive and John Won
Case Number: 2:2019cv02795
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (lc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. Dismissal is Without. (Jeong, Chan)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than May 23, 2019 why this action should notbe dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants: A'Gaci, L.L.C., John Won. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Answer by the defendant(s). No oral argument. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant J & DONG FASHION, INC. (lc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant J and Dong Fashion, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chan Yong Jeong) (Jeong, Chan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc., upon Defendant J and Dong Fashion, Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jeong, Chan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc., upon Defendant John Won served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jeong, Chan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc., upon Defendant A'Gaci, L.L.C. served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Won, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jeong, Chan)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants A'Gaci, L.L.C., J and Dong Fashion, Inc., John Won. (car)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Jitrade, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc., (Jeong, Chan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Jeong, Chan)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23535797 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jitrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party Jitrade, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jitrade, Inc. v. A'Gaci, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A'Gaci, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & Dong Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J and Dong Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Won
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jitrade, Inc.
Represented By: Chan Yong Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?