United States of America v. 8,500.00 In U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $8,500.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, $3,125.00 IN MORONGO CASINO CHIPS, 8,500.00 In U.S. Currency and 3,125.00 In Morongo Casino Chips
Case Number: 2:2019cv02804
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed on 5/7/2019. Remarks: Seized $3,125.00 as CV 19-2804 on 5/7/2019. (iv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed on 5/7/2019. Remarks: Seized $8,500.00 as CV19-2804 on 05/07/2019. (iv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Warrant for seizure returned executed. (iv)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Warrant for seizure returned executed. (iv)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant All Defendants. Publication was made in the OFFICIAL GOVERNMENT WEBSITE: www.forfeiture.gov. FOR 30 CONSECUTIVE DAYS. (Whittlesey, Brent)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cr-00782 MWF. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02804 MWF(MRWx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT for seizure of 8,500.00 In U.S. Currency and 3,125.00 In Morongo Casino Chips issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Whittlesey, Brent)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): 2:18-cr-00782 (Whittlesey, Brent)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Whittlesey, Brent)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on APRIL 11, 2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Whittlesey, Brent)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Whittlesey, Brent)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Brent A Whittlesey added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Whittlesey, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 8,500.00 In U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,500.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,125.00 IN MORONGO CASINO CHIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8,500.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3,125.00 In Morongo Casino Chips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Brent A Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?