Rafael Munoz Gonzalez v. United States of America

Petitioner: Rafael Munoz Gonzalez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02806
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Respondent United States of America. (Evans, Abigail)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Declaring Partial Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Compelling Disclosure of Certain Attorney-Client Communications #10 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for DECLARING PARTIAL WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATIONS filed by plaintiff/respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Evans, Abigail)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING THE FILING DEADLINES by Judge R. Gary Klausner that The deadline for the government to file its response to Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 is continued from 5/23/2019 to 6/14/2019. Petitioner's deadline to file his Reply is continued to 7/19/2019. (jp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to 28 USC 2255 Motion Pursuant to Rule 15, FRCP #1 filed by Petitioner Rafael Munoz Gonzalez. (jp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Abigail W Evans counsel for Respondent United States of America. Adding Abigail W. Evans as counsel of record for USA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Attorney Abigail W Evans added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Evans, Abigail)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT HIS 28 USC 2255 MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE (15), FED. R.CIV.P. Rafael Munoz Gonzalez. (lom) Modified on 5/1/2019 (lom).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY PURSUANT TO 28 USC 2255 #1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: ORDERS the government to respond to said motion no later than 5/23/2019. FURTHER ORDERS petitioner's reply to be filed and served no later than 6/27/2019. The matter will be deemed submitted, and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (jp)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 RAFAEL MUNOZ GONZALEZ'S EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF 28 USC 2255 MOTION #1 . EXHIBITS 1 THROUGH 3 (car)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SECTION 2255 MOTION #1 filed by Petitioner Rafael Munoz Gonzalez. (car)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (car)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:10-cr-00567-RGK-1, filed by Petitioner Rafael Munoz Gonzalez. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafael Munoz Gonzalez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Abigail W Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Munoz Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?