Jorge Valdes v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC et al

Plaintiff: JORGE VALDES
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC and NRT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02822
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENT to Response in Opposition to Motion, #31 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Duguid v. Facebook, Inc.)(Kaufman, Rachel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss or Stay #28 is taken off the 6/20/2019 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 6/20/2019. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC and NRT, LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #28 Defendants Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLLC, and NRT, LLCs Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay Proceedings; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC, NRT, LLC. (Wright, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC and NRT, LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #28 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Kaufman, Rachel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC, NRT, LLC, (Wright, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 5/21/2019, or the motion may be stricken. (vdr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC and NRT, LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attorney Michael J Wright added to party Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft)) (Wright, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #24 APPLICATION to Amend/Correct First APPLICATION to Amend First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/24/2019, Receipt No. 097323613013) #21
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes, upon Defendant Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Razer Rahman, registered agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Siman, Afshin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes, upon Defendant NRT, LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Razer Rahman, registered agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Siman, Afshin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 First APPLICATION to Amend First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/24/2019, Receipt No. 097323613013) #21 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Siman, Afshin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes #21 . The document is stricken. The Certificate of Good Standing for the state of New Jersey not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (vv)
April 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/24/2019, Receipt No. 097323613013) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Other error(s) with document(s): FL and NJ are out of date. (lt)
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 ***STRICKEN REFER TO DOCUMENT NUMBER 23***First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 4/24/2019, Receipt No. 097323613013) filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Siman, Afshin) Modified on 4/25/2019 (vv).
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to NRT, LLC NRT, LLC. (lom)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC. (lom)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Avi R Kaufman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jorge Valdes, designating Afshin Siman as local counsel. (lom)
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Avi R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23562858) filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Siman, Afshin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application, #15 Incorrect document was attached to the entry. Correct Response is attached to this Notice of Clerical Error. (lt)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Stefan Coleman on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am currently waiting for the Certificates of Good Standing from New York and New Jersey and will file the PHV motion as soon as I receive them. (lt) Modified on 4/15/2019 (lt).
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Courts Initial Standing Order found on the Courts Website under Judge Olguins Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Kaufman, Rachel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Kaufman, Rachel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes, (Kaufman, Rachel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Coleman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Avi R. Kaufman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff JORGE VALDES. (Siman, Afshin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff JORGE VALDES. (Siman, Afshin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JORGE VALDES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siman, Afshin)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23539494 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff JORGE VALDES. (Attorney Afshin Siman added to party JORGE VALDES(pty:pla))(Siman, Afshin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorge Valdes v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Represented By: Michael J Wright
Represented By: Calvin E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRT, LLC
Represented By: Aaron P Rudin
Represented By: Michael J Wright
Represented By: Calvin E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE VALDES
Represented By: Afshin Siman
Represented By: Avi R Kaufman
Represented By: Rachel Kaufman
Represented By: Stefan L Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?