Renee Friermor v. Charter Communications Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Renee Friermor
Defendant: Charter Communications Inc. and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02830
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 STATEMENT OF DECISION REGARDING DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court GRANTS Charter's Motion and orders the parties to arbitration. The Court also STAYS this action pending the outcome of arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court every 120 days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings, with the first joint status report due on August 26, 2019. (iv)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS [filed 5/3/2019; Docket No. #21 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is GRANTED. The parties shall file a joint status report with the Court every 120 days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings, with the first joint status report due on August 26, 2019. (iv)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF LODGING filed PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION REGARDING DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS)(Lally, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 STATEMENT of of Decision NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #21 (Proposed) filed by Plaintiff Renee Friermor. (Fields, Joshua)
May 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. (Lally, Amy)
May 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Renee Friermor, identifying Renee Friermor and Charter Communications, Inc.. (Fields, Joshua)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #16 by Judge John F. Walter. Deadline to initially answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to and including May 3, 2019. (iv)
May 13, 2019 Filing 24 Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #21 filed by Plaintiff Renee Friermor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joshua A. Fields, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Renee Friermor, #4 Declaration Adam Abugov, #5 Supplement Objections to Evidence)(Fields, Joshua)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO WAIVE RULE 23-3 [filed 5/6/2019; Docket No. #22 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Class Certification on or before July 11, 2019. (iv)
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Waive Local Rule 23-3 filed by plaintiff Renee Friermor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fields, Joshua)
May 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by DEFENDANT Charter Communications Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, #2 Declaration OF DANIEL J. BOLLINGER, #3 Declaration OF CHRISTINE FLORES, #4 Declaration OF HOWARD POINTER, #5 Declaration OF ADAM MOORE, #6 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS) (Lally, Amy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by plaintiff Renee Friermor. (Fields, Joshua)
April 29, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Joshua A. Fields LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Plaintiff Renee Friermor. (Fields, Joshua)
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc. (Lally, Amy)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for June 24, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 3, 2019. (iv)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Charter Communications Inc. answer now due 5/3/2019, filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT)(Lally, Amy)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. (Lally, Amy)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Amy P. Lally as Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. (Lally, Amy)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (sr)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ENTRY ORDER: DENYING without prejudice Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration #11 to refiling in accordance with this Court's Standing Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Charter's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration of Howard Pointer, #3 Declaration of Daniel J. Bollinger, #4 Declaration of Christine Flores, #5 Declaration of Adam Moore, #6 Proposed Order Granting Charter's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, #7 Proof of Service) (Lally, Amy) Modified on 4/22/2019 (sr).
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa)
April 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Charter Communications Inc., Does 1-50, inclusive, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Renee Friermor. (Filed in state court 3/5/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF FILING NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lally, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Charter Communications Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #6 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 served on April 12, 2019. (Lally, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adriane Kayoko Peralta counsel for Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. Adding Adriane Peralta as counsel of record for Charter Communications, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attorney Adriane Kayoko Peralta added to party Charter Communications Inc.(pty:dft))(Peralta, Adriane)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexis Miller Buese counsel for Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. Adding Alexis Miller Buese as counsel of record for Charter Communications, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attorney Alexis Miller Buese added to party Charter Communications Inc.(pty:dft))(Buese, Alexis)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy P Lally counsel for Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. Adding Amy P. Lally as counsel of record for Charter Communications, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc.. (Lally, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.S NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc., identifying Liberty Broadband Corporation. (Lally, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. (Lally, Amy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, case number 19STCV07447 Receipt No: 0973-23540955 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Charter Communications Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW KARDOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441, #2 Declaration OF AMY P. LALLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.S NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441, #3 COMPLAINT, #4 SUMMONS, #5 LASC CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, #6 LASC INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE, #7 LASC MINUTE ORDER) (Attorney Amy P Lally added to party Charter Communications Inc.(pty:dft))(Lally, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renee Friermor v. Charter Communications Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Inc.
Represented By: Adriane Kayoko Peralta
Represented By: Amy P Lally
Represented By: Alexis Miller Buese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Friermor
Represented By: Joshua Adam Fields
Represented By: Michael L Kelly
Represented By: Behram V Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?