Texkhan, Inc. v. En Creme et al

Plaintiff: Texkhan, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, En Creme, Poshmark, Inc., Promgirl, LLC and DMW Dresses LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02850
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Promgirl, LLC answer now due 8/8/2019, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #17 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Promgirl, LLC.(Strache, Kyle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Promgirl, LLC (Strache, Kyle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kyle Vos Strache on behalf of Defendant Promgirl, LLC (Attorney Kyle Vos Strache added to party Promgirl, LLC(pty:dft))(Strache, Kyle)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having reviewed Plaintiff's notice of settlement as to Defendant En Creme #16 , the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause dated June 10, 2019 #14 . IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc., upon Defendant Promgirl, LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christina Gallo, Senior Manager in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chang, Hyunsuk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Bizz, Inc., d/b/a En Creme filed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc.. (Chang, Hyunsuk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Poshmark, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc..(Chang, Hyunsuk)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 6/24/2019 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant En Creme for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): En Creme; or, Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant En Creme if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc., upon Defendant En Creme served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ben Kim, showroom manager in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chang, Hyunsuk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Poshmark, Inc. answer now due 6/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Poshmark, Inc..(Daughtrey, Natasha)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Poshmark, Inc. (Daughtrey, Natasha)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Natasha E Daughtrey counsel for Defendant Poshmark, Inc.. Adding Natasha Daughtrey as counsel of record for Poshmark, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Poshmark, Inc.. (Attorney Natasha E Daughtrey added to party Poshmark, Inc.(pty:dft))(Daughtrey, Natasha)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants En Creme, Poshmark, Inc., Promgirl, LLC. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Page 2)(Chang, Hyunsuk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Texkhan, Inc.. (Chang, Hyunsuk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc.. (Chang, Hyunsuk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc., (Chang, Hyunsuk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23545457 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Texkhan, Inc.. (Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Texkhan, Inc.(pty:pla))(Chang, Hyunsuk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texkhan, Inc. v. En Creme et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: En Creme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poshmark, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha E Daughtrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Promgirl, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Vos Strache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMW Dresses LLC
Represented By: Kyle Vos Strache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texkhan, Inc.
Represented By: Hyunsuk A Chang
Represented By: Grace Hyojung Jang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?