Brian Whitaker v. Macys West Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Macys West Stores, Inc. and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02862
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: MOTION to Stay Case #15 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): failure to meet and confer, see Local Rule 7-3. (vdr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Macys West Stores, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, identifying Macy's, Inc. as the corporate parent of Macy's West Stores, Inc. (Karitani, Sayaka)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Macys West Stores, Inc., Starbucks Corporation.(Karitani, Sayaka)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 **STRICKEN** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Appeal filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 PNA, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 ExhibitB, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Price, Dennis) Modified on 6/19/2019 (vdr).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #13 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #13 Request to Substitute Attorney Sayaka Karitani as attorney of record instead of Attorney Myra B Villamor for Starbucks Corporation, a Washington corporation. (lom)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Sayaka Karitani in place of attorney Myra B. Villamor filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Sayaka Karitani added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft)) (Karitani, Sayaka)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Macys West Stores, Inc..(Attorney Sayaka Karitani added to party Macys West Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Karitani, Sayaka)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Macys West Stores, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christian Doe - Receptionist /Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Starbucks Corporation answer now due 6/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Villamor, Myra)
May 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY (Becky De George - Agent for service) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Macys West Stores, Inc., Starbucks Corporation. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23547283 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Macys West Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys West Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Sayaka Karitani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Sayaka Karitani
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?