Elaine Marie Walker Earle v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Elaine Marie Walker Earle
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Group Basic Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of University of Southern California and Does 1 through 10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02903
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Nicole Y. Blohm Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Blohm, Nicole)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 29, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 15, 2019. (iv)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, identifying Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Nunneri, Tatiana)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Blohm, Nicole)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #13 by Judge John F. Walter. Unum Life's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to June 14, 2019. (iv)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS GROUP BASIC ACCIDENTAL DEATH AND DISMEMBERMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA #13 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant GROUP BASIC ACCIDENTAL DEATH AND DISMEMBERMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA be dismissed from this action without prejudice, with the Parties to bear their own attorney' fees and costs directly related to the instant Stipulation. (iv)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Group Basic Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of University of Southern California filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elaine Marie Walker Earle, upon Defendant Group Basic Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of University of Southern California served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elaine Marie Walker Earle, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 6/14/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Nunneri, Tatiana)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Group Basic Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of University of Southern California. (ghap)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (ghap)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elaine Marie Walker Earle, identifying UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Group Basic Accidental Death And Dismemberment Plan for Employees of University of Southern California. (Horrow, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Marie Walker Earle. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Horrow, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Elaine Marie Walker Earle. (Horrow, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23553617 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Elaine Marie Walker Earle. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Elaine Marie Walker Earle(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elaine Marie Walker Earle v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Basic Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of University of Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Marie Walker Earle
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Represented By: Scott E Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?