N. M. v. Glendale Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: N. M.
Defendant: Annie Ghazarian, Glendale Unified School District and DOES 1 through 30, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02924
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (gga)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 6/11/2020. Motions due by 8/10/2020. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/14/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 at 8:30 a.m. (gga)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Defendant Glendale Unified School District. (Doumanian, Nancy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Annie Ghazarian, identifying N.M.; Glendale Unified School District; Annie Ghazarian; Paul Grossman, Esq.; Nancy P. Doumanian, Esq.; and Raul M. Montes, Esq.. (Montes, Raul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Raul M Montes counsel for Defendant Annie Ghazarian. Adding Raul M. Montes as counsel of record for Annie Ghazarian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Raul M. Montes. (Montes, Raul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Annie Ghazarian.(Attorney Raul M Montes added to party Annie Ghazarian(pty:dft))(Montes, Raul)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 27, 2019. (gga)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO STATE COURT COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by DEFENDANT Glendale Unified School District.(Doumanian, Nancy)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-02924 CJC(JEMx). (rn)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
April 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-23568784 for $400 filing fee. (Doumanian, Nancy)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
April 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 30, inclusive, Annie Ghazarian, Glendale Unified School District.Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff N. M. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/9/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Glendale Unified School District. (Doumanian, Nancy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Nancy Doumanian re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Glendale Unified School District. (Doumanian, Nancy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Cases filed by Defendant Glendale Unified School District. (Doumanian, Nancy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Glendale Unified School District, identifying Plaintiff N.M.; Paul Grossman, Esq., Glendale Unified School District, Nancy P. Doumanian. (Doumanian, Nancy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC697780 Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Defendant Glendale Unified School District. (Attorney Nancy Prapion Doumanian added to party Glendale Unified School District(pty:dft))(Doumanian, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. M. v. Glendale Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Ghazarian
Represented By: Raul M Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Unified School District
Represented By: Nancy Prapion Doumanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.
Represented By: Paul Grossman
Represented By: Theodore Irving Kreit
Represented By: Dennis Alan Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?