Michael Anthony Torres v. United States of America

Petitioner: Michael Anthony Torres
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02927
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney Ali Moghaddas on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Jason C Pang terminated. (Attorney Ali Moghaddas added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Moghaddas, Ali)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Government's Ex Parte Application for Court Order Declaring partial Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Compelling Disclosure of Certain Attorney-Client Communication #10 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for WAIVER FOR A-C PRIVILEGES filed by respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pang, Jason)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Government's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time #6 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the Government's response i sdue no later than 7/20/2019. Petitioner's Reply is due no later than 8/17/2019. The matter will be deemed submitted. (jp)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for the government shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry 6 (to the Judge's generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. TEXT ONLY ENTRY THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of PROOF OF SERVICE TO PETITIONER re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Response date from May 21, 2019 to July 20, 2019 #6 (Pang, Jason)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Response date from May 21, 2019 to July 20, 2019 filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pang, Jason)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Jason C. Pang United States of America. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR terminated. (Attorney Jason C Pang added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Pang, Jason)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Re Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence By A Person In Federal Custody Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 #1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: hereby ORDERS the government to respond to said motion no later than 5/21/2019. FURTHER ORDERS petitioner's reply to be filed and served no later than 6/18/2019. The matter will be deemed submitted. (jp)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (esa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion under 28 USC 2255 filed by petitioner Michael Anthony Torres. (esa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:10-cr-567 AHM, filed by petitioner Michael Anthony Torres. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Anthony Torres v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Ali Moghaddas
Represented By: Jason C Pang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Anthony Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?