Douglas Hayes Menuez v. Ezvid Inc.

Plaintiff: Douglas H Menuez
Defendant: Ezvid Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02934
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (jp)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION Withdrawing, Sealing and Striking Docket Entry Number #16 #17 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw Docket Entry 16 filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 ** STRICKEN **NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez. (Grossbardt, Jonah) Modified on 6/5/2019 (rfi).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #14 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ezvid Inc. answer now due 6/10/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Ezvid Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nina Boyajian, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyajian, Nina)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ezvid Inc. identifying n/a as Corporate Parent. (Boyajian, Nina)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nina D Boyajian counsel for Defendant Ezvid Inc.. Adding Nina D. Boyajian as counsel of record for Ezvid, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ezvid, Inc.. (Attorney Nina D Boyajian added to party Ezvid Inc.(pty:dft))(Boyajian, Nina)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez, upon Defendant Ezvid Inc. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alexander Rousmaniere, registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ezvid Inc. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Douglas H Menuez. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23559804 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Douglas H Menuez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Douglas H Menuez(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas Hayes Menuez v. Ezvid Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas H Menuez
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezvid Inc.
Represented By: Nina D Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?