Jessyka Walker v. Norred and Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jessyka Walker
Defendant: Norred & Associates, Inc., Norred and Associates, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02944
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO BRIEFLY EXTEND STAY #16 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. The stay of this case, as set forth in the Court's May 23, 2019 Order, is extended for 30 additional days; 2. The Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and continued to August 8, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Sbardellati, #2 Proposed Order)(Sbardellati, Anthony)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING IN PART JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE AND VACATE/CONTINUE DEADLINES by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Stay Case #14 : NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. The Court, having considered the Stipulation and good cause appearing therefore, HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. This case is stayed in its entirety for a period of SIXTY DAYS; 2. All deadlines, dates, and events presently on calendar are vacated and continued for a period of SIXTY (60) days; 3. A post-mediation status conference is scheduled for Monday, July 8, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (bm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Sbardellati, #2 Proposed Order)(Sbardellati, Anthony)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court - Central District filed by plaintiff Jessyka Walker. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement) (Aviles, Diego)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Regina A Musolino counsel for Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc.. Adding Regina A. Musolino as counsel of record for Norred and Associates, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc.. (Attorney Regina A Musolino added to party Norred and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Musolino, Regina)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Social Security) filed by Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc..(Sbardellati, Anthony)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Standing Order filed by Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc.. (Sbardellati, Anthony)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
April 16, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jessyka Walker, upon Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kimberly T Bernstein, Attorney for defendant Norred and Associates, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
April 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jessyka Walker, upon Defendant Norred and Associates, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 1003 Virginia Avenue Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30354 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
April 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Norred and Associates, Inc., filed by plaintiff Jessyka Walker. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/1/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Norred & Associates, Inc.. Related Case(s): Eva Lopez v. Norred & Associates, Inc., Case No. 5:19-cv-00558-SVW-SK (Sbardellati, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Norred & Associates, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Jessyka Walker and Defendant Norred & Associates, Inc.. (Sbardellati, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Norred & Associates, Inc. identifying Norred & Associates, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Sbardellati, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Norred & Associates, Inc.. (Sbardellati, Anthony)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV07093 Receipt No: 0973-23561322 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Norred & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Bohling in Support of Removal, #2 Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati - Proof of Service by Mail, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati - Notice and Acknowledgment, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati - Notice of Minute Order, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati - LASC Docket, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Anthony Sbardellati - Lopez v Norred Complaint) (Attorney Anthony David Sbardellati added to party Norred & Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sbardellati, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessyka Walker v. Norred and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessyka Walker
Represented By: Diego F Aviles
Represented By: David D Bibiyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norred & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony David Sbardellati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norred and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Regina A Musolino
Represented By: Kimberly T Bernstein
Represented By: Anthony David Sbardellati
Represented By: Sarah Kroll-Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?