Rosario Gelera v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Rosario Gelera
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02949
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Josephine L Staton
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney In Seon Jeong added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Jeong, In)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rosario Gelera, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Deborah L. Stachel, Regional Chief Counsel, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel-Region IX. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Koenig, Andrew)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated 4/21/17) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rosario Gelera, identifying Joseph C. Gallas. (Koenig, Andrew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rosario Gelera. (Koenig, Andrew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rosario Gelera. (Koenig, Andrew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23562838 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rosario Gelera. (Attorney Andrew Thomas Koenig added to party Rosario Gelera(pty:pla))(Koenig, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario Gelera v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: In Seon Jeong
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Gelera
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?