Latitude, LLC v. Dion Primous et al

Plaintiff: Latitude, LLC
Defendant: Dion Primous, Erica Martin and Does 1 to 10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv02965
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 Receipt of Remand of April 19, 2019 by Los Angeles Superior Court, Northwest District, Slymar ( SEE FILED STAMP ON RECEIPT PORTION which appears to be ERRONEOUS DATE OF "JAN 24, 2019" signed by State Court Clerk) (lc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court, Northwest District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, Northwest District, Van Nuys, No.18VEUD05R27 (lc)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case Remanded to Los Angeles Superior Court, Northwest District, Van Nuys, Case number 18VEUD05R27 Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lc)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Case is remanded by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Erica Martin, re Notice of Removal, #1 served on 4/17/19. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Erica Martin. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Erica Martin (car)
April 17, 2019 NON-CONFORMED ANSWER to Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendants Dion Primous and Erica Martin. Submitted attached to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 4/19/2019 (car).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 18VEUD05R27 with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, filed by Defendant Erica Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latitude, LLC v. Dion Primous et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latitude, LLC
Represented By: Serena Yun
Represented By: Chris J Evans
Represented By: Valerie Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Primous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?