Jose Luis Solis-Hughes v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Solis-Hughes
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv03010
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Solis-Hughes, served on May 28, 2019. (Kurtz, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall file the attachments as separate documents by 12 noon on April 24, 2019. (jp)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Summons and No. 3 Certificate as to Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (lh)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23575793 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jose Luis Solis-Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Certification and Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Elizabeth Anne Kurtz added to party Jose Luis Solis-Hughes(pty:pla))(Kurtz, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Luis Solis-Hughes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Solis-Hughes
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?