De Well Container Shipping, Inc. v. Sentiments, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: De Well Container Shipping, Inc.
Defendant: Shohreh Dadbin, Benjamin Alex Dadbin and Sentiments, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03200
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Arenas, Paul)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc., upon Defendant Benjamin Alex Dadbin served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Benjamin Dadbin by leaving copies with Diane Hernandez (Human Resources) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diligence, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service by Mail)(Arenas, Paul)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant De Well Container Shipping, Inc., upon Defendant Shohreh Dadbin served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Shohreh Dadbin by leaving copies with Dian Hernandez (Human Resources) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diligence, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service by Mail)(Arenas, Paul)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc., upon Defendant Sentiments, Inc. served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shohreh Dadbin, agent for service of process, c/o Diana "Doe", Office Manager for Sentiments, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arenas, Paul)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Benjamin Alex Dadbin. (lh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Shohreh Dadbin. (lh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Sentiments, Inc. (lh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc.. (Arenas, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc.. (Arenas, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc.. (Arenas, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc.. (Arenas, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc., identifying Shanghai De Well Container Transport Co. Ltd.. (Arenas, Paul)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23603373 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff De Well Container Shipping, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Combined Transport Bill of Lading Terms and Conditions, #2 Exhibit B-Spreadsheet Reflecting amounts owed, #3 Exhibit C-Credit Agreement and Application) (Attorney Paul B Arenas added to party De Well Container Shipping, Inc.(pty:pla))(Arenas, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Well Container Shipping, Inc. v. Sentiments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De Well Container Shipping, Inc.
Represented By: Paul B Arenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shohreh Dadbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Alex Dadbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentiments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?