Copoliva Inc. v. Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.

Plaintiff: Copoliva Inc.
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv03237
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DISMISS MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA) INC. #11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, (lc) Modified on 7/1/2019 (lc).
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Amend filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marissen, James)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JUNE 28, 2019 #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 28, 2019 filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marissen, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc. answer now due 5/31/2019, filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc..(Marissen, James)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See document for specifics. (lom)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
April 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc., filed by plaintiff Copoliva Inc. (Filed in state court 3/21/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. (Marissen, James)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc., (Marissen, James)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.. (Marissen, James)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 19STCV09869 Receipt No: 0973-23608456 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal - Parties in State Court, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney James Arthur Henry Marissen added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. (pty:dft))(Marissen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copoliva Inc. v. Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company USA Inc.
Represented By: Rachel A Weitzman
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Copoliva Inc.
Represented By: Mark S Shipow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?