United States of America v. 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Vicki Uleman, 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California, San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller, Treasurer, Tax Collector, Verona D. Butler, Vicki Primeaux-Uleman, Richard Olhoffer, Patty Holmes, Dewey S. Butler, Jack T. Holmes, Richard Primeaux and Chicago Title Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03250
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE executed Disclaimer of Interest by Chicago Title Company filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Plant, Miles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 06/01/2019 and 06/08/2019 upon Defendant Dewey S. Butler last date of publication 6/15/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Verona D. Butler last date of publication 6/15/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Richard Primeaux last date of publication 6/15/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Publication was made in the 06/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Plant, Miles)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSIT OF ESTIMATE OF JUST COMPENSATION INTO AN INTERESTS-BEARING ACCOUNT IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY #13 by Judge Manuel L. Real. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall accept the deposit of eight thousand dollars and no cents ($8,000.00) tendered by the United States, including by wire transfer or check, and shall deposit these funds into an interest-bearing account under the terms and conditions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Civil Rule 67. (lom)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Chicago Title Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jordan Trachtenberg. (Plant, Miles)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Notice of Publication for Service on Defendants Unknown Heirs of Richard Primeaux and Unknown Heirs of Dewey S. Butler and Verona D. Butler (Plant, Miles)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds Estimate of Just Compensation filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Plant, Miles)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller, Treasurer, Tax Collector. (Norton, Mitchell)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Vicki Uleman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Vicki Uleman. (Plant, Miles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Richard Olhoffer waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard Olhoffer. (Plant, Miles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Patty Holmes waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Patty Holmes. (Plant, Miles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Jack T. Holmes waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Jack T. Holmes. (Plant, Miles)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller, Treasurer, Tax Collector waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/29/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Mitchell Norton. (Plant, Miles)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties/Defendants)(Plant, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION OF TAKING filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties/Defendants)(Plant, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States. (Plant, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties/Defendants) (Attorney Miles H Plant added to party United States(pty:pla))(Plant, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Uleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller, Treasurer, Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verona D. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Primeaux-Uleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Olhoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey S. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack T. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Primeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Miles H Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?