Sergio Jovany Escobar Miranda v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Jovany Escobar Mirancla and Sergio Jovany Escobar Miranda
Defendant: Jon Doe, County of Los Angeles and Salvador
Case Number: 2:2019cv03320
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: RE #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of forty-five (45) days from the date of this order by which to file his First Amended Complaint. (dc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sergio Jovany Escobar Miranda.(hr)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Miranda's Complaint is dismissed in its entirety, without prejudice, and with leave to amend. If Miranda would like to continue to prosecute this action, Miranda must file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") within twenty-one (21) days of the service date of this Order. (Attachments: #1 Blank Complaint Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal) (dc)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re: Notice Re: Clerical Error #6 . The Clerk is directed to update the Court's docket and records to the correct spelling of Plaintiff's last name from "Mirancla" to "Miranda" and to correct the title of Defendant Jon Doe from "Leach Cook" to "Lead Cook." (hr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Re: Clerical Error filed by Plaintiff Sergio Jovany Escobar Mirancla.(hr)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. (dc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jp)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Sergio Jovany Escobar Mirancla. (jp)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants County of Los Angeles, Jon Doe, Salvador pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, filed by plaintiff Sergio Jovany Escobar Mirancla. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sergio Jovany Escobar Miranda v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Jovany Escobar Mirancla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Jovany Escobar Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?