Samuel Walker et al v. Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Walker and Frances Walkers
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Shulton Inc., Whittaker Controls, Inc., Foseco Inc., Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Oglebay Norton Company LLC, Lenderink Technologies, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Union Carbide Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Does 1-450 inclusive, Long Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Oglebay Norton Company and Allied-Signal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03410
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Cormac J Carney
2 Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
3 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The OSC Talc Actions are hereby REMANDED to state court. Any motions or ex parte applications to remand that are pending in the OSC Talc Actions are DENIED AS MOOT, and the hearings vacated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rrey)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in support of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY REMAINING CENTRAL DISTRICT TALC ACTIONS SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED filed by Plaintiffs Samuel Walker, Frances Walkers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Nideffer, Conor)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.to Order to Show Cause,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia E. Romano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H Part 1, #10 Exhibit H Part 2, #11 Exhibit H Part 3, #12 Exhibit H Part 4, #13 Exhibit I Part 1, #14 Exhibit I Part 2, #15 Exhibit I Part 3, #16 Exhibit I Part 4, #17 Exhibit I Part 5, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K Part 1, #20 Exhibit K Part 2, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M)(Romano, Julia)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY REMAINING CENTRAL DISTRICT TALC ACTIONS SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court hereby ORDERS Johnson & Johnson to show cause why the remaining Central District Talc Actions should not be remanded. Johnson & Johnson shall respond in writing by Monday, May 13, 2019. The plaintiffs in these actions shall file a response, if any, by the following Monday, May 20, 2019. The Court will then take the matter under submission and issue a ruling no later than Monday, June 3, 2019. (rrey)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., re Notice (Other) #5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on April 29, 2019. (Stewart, Jennifer)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-03036 CJC(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03410 CJC(JCx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Electronic Filing re Answer to Complaint, Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Amended Complaint,, e-mailed to Conor R Nideffer at conor@nidefferlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.2 - Bad destination host 'DNS Hard Error looking up nidefferlaw.com. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
April 26, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.(FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC722130, SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 26, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Does, Foseco Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Lenderink Technologies, Inc., Long Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Oglebay Norton Company LLC, Shulton Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Whittaker Controls, Inc., filed by Plaintiffs Frances Walkers, Samuel Walker. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC713775 ON 12/04/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS [L.R. 83-1.4] AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Stewart, Jennifer)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number BC713775 Receipt No: 0973-23625435 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit D) (Attorney Jennifer Taylor Stewart added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Taylor Stewart added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft))(Stewart, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel Walker et al v. Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shulton Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oglebay Norton Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenderink Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-450 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Drug Stores California, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oglebay Norton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Walker
Represented By: Conor R Nideffer
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Walkers
Represented By: Conor R Nideffer
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?