Roxana Dominguez et al v. Brenntag North America Inc.
Plaintiff: Roxana Dominguez
Defendant: Conopco, Inc., Cytec Industries, Inc., Shulton Inc., Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Helen of Troy, L.P., Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Does 1-450 inclusive, Unilever United States, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., The Procter and Gamble Company, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Brenntag North America, Inc., Henkel Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Cirrus Enterprises, LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, and as successor to Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company doing business as Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. doing business as Charles Mathieu Inc, Helen of Troy, L.P. doing business as Brut, Wyeth Holdings Corporation f, Unilever United States, Inc. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Chesebrough Manufacturing Company a/k/a Chesebrough-Ponds doing business as Brut, Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc. and Conopco, Inc. a subsidiary of Unilever Home and Personal Care USA d/b/a Brut (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Chesebrough Manufacturing Company a/k/a Chesebrough-Ponds)
Case Number: 2:2019cv03419
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Remand #15 and directs the Clerk to REMAND this action to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. JCCP 4674 / BC650123. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REMAND TO STATE COURT (DKT. #15 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on June 14, 2019, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Orders and Entries of Rulings By District Judges Relating To The Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Removed Actions filed by Plaintiff Roxana Dominguez. (Nideffer, Conor)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John Nolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., designating Julia E. Romano as local counsel #20 . (gk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Junior Counsel [Standing Order P.3] filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Romano, Julia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Nolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23870506) filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Romano, Julia)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Roxana Dominguez. of Orders and Entries of Rulings By District Judges Relating to the Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Removed Actions (Nideffer, Conor)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Roxana Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Conor Nideffer)(Nideffer, Conor)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia R. Romano)(Romano, Julia)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL ORDERS IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT filed by plaintiff Roxana Dominguez. (Nideffer, Conor)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Roxana Dominguez. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Nideffer, Conor)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Roxana Dominguez. Notice of Orders and Entries of Rulings by Judges of this Court and the Delaware District Court (Nideffer, Conor)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Pendency of Other Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Romano, Julia)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Movant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s), #5 served on April 30, 2019. (George, Carter)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-03036 CJC(JCx). (mrgo)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Electronic Filing re Amended Complaint,, Answer to Complaint, Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 e-mailed to Conor R Nideffer at conor@nidefferlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.2 - Bad destination host 'DNS Hard Error looking up nidefferlaw.com. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh)
April 26, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC650123 ON 11/06/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(Attorney Amy Zumsteg added to party Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.(pty:dft))(lh)
April 26, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cirrus Enterprises, LLC, Conopco, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cytec Industries, Inc., Helen of Troy, L.P., Henkel Corporation, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Shulton Inc., The Procter and Gamble Company, Unilever United States, Inc., Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC, Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC, Does 1-450, filed by Plaintiff Roxana Dominguez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC650123 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. , Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] and request for Stay of Proceedings Related Case(s): Case Nos. 2:19-10289-LSS; 1:19-mc-00103-UNA (George, Carter)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., (George, Carter)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent. (George, Carter)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (George, Carter)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number JCCP 4674 / BC650123 Receipt No: 0973-23626500 - Fee: $400, filed by Movant Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer, #4 Exhibit B - Answer to First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Part 1, #6 Exhibit C - Part 2, #7 Exhibit C - Part 3, #8 Exhibit C - Part 4, #9 Exhibit C - Part 5, #10 Exhibit C - Part 6, #11 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet) (Attorney Carter Lyon George added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.(pty:mov))(George, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roxana Dominguez et al v. Brenntag North America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cytec Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shulton Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-450 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter and Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Represented By: Carter Lyon George
Represented By: John Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirrus Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, and as successor to Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company doing business as Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. doing business as Charles Mathieu Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen of Troy, L.P. doing business as Brut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings Corporation f
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Chesebrough Manufacturing Company a/k/a Chesebrough-Ponds doing business as Brut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc. a subsidiary of Unilever Home and Personal Care USA d/b/a Brut (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Chesebrough Manufacturing Company a/k/a Chesebrough-Ponds)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxana Dominguez
Represented By: Conor R Nideffer
Represented By: John M Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?