Michael I Goldberg v. Comerica Bank

Plaintiff: Michael I. Goldberg
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv03439
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Comerica Bank, identifying Comerica Incorporated. (Smerek, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware for referral to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1412 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #22 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Smerek, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Stephen R. Smerek in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware for referral to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1412 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #22 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Smerek, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Count V of Plaintiff's Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion to Strike) (Smerek, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss) (Smerek, Stephen)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware for referral to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1412 filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. Motion set for hearing on 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Motion to Transfer) (Smerek, Stephen)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas B. Walsh IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank, designating Stephen R. Smerek as local counsel #19 . (gk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas B. Walsh IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Comerica Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23983586) filed by Defendant Comerica Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen R Smerek added to party Comerica Bank(pty:dft)) (Smerek, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen R. Smerek. (LippSmith, Graham)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-00103 DMG(KSx) (rn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg, as Trustee for the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, designating Graham LippSmith as local counsel #6 . (gk)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jason Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg, as Trustee for the Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, designating Graham LippSmith as local counsel #5 . (gk)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Comerica Bank. (jp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-00103-DMG-KS (LippSmith, Graham)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23628551) #6 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason K. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23628480) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jaclyn L Anderson on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg (Attorney Jaclyn L Anderson added to party Michael I. Goldberg(pty:pla))(Anderson, Jaclyn)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey C. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23628551) filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LippSmith, Graham)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason K. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23628480) filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LippSmith, Graham)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg, (LippSmith, Graham)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. (LippSmith, Graham)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. (LippSmith, Graham)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23627752 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael I. Goldberg. (Attorney Graham B LippSmith added to party Michael I. Goldberg(pty:pla))(LippSmith, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael I Goldberg v. Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael I. Goldberg
Represented By: Graham B LippSmith
Represented By: Jaclyn L Anderson
Represented By: Jason Kellogg
Represented By: Jeffrey C Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Represented By: Stephen R Smerek
Represented By: Thomas B Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?