Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. v. Momentum Logistics Corp.,

Plaintiff: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
Defendant: Momentum Logistics Corp., a California corporation, Does 1-10 and Momentum Logistics Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03582
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #11 , hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Marissen, James)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., upon Defendant Momentum Logistics Corp. served on 5/3/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mrs. Jane Koo, person in charge and authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Marissen, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Momentum Logistics Corp. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 e-mailed to Rachel A Weitzman at aweitzman@grsm.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipientNotFound; Recipient not found by SMTP address lookup. Primary e-mail address has been corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to rweitzman@grsm.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (jp)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. (Marissen, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., (Marissen, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Marissen, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Marissen, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23640731 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Attorney James Arthur Henry Marissen added to party Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.(pty:pla))(Marissen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. v. Momentum Logistics Corp.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
Represented By: James Arthur Henry Marissen
Represented By: Rachel A Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Logistics Corp., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Logistics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?